Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9624102 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2015321909 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261946 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013FR52991 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150093824 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1261946 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013FR52991 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2931653 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261946 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013FR52991 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2894471 | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261946 | 12.12.2012 | WO2013FR52991 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014091127 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261946 | 12.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2999167 | 26.12.2014 | B1 | FR2999167 | 13.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261946 | 12.12.2012 |