EP2931653 - PYROTECHNIC PROCESS FOR PROVIDING VERY HIGHLY PURE HYDROGEN AND ASSOCIATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArianeGroup SAS Tour Cristal 7-11 Quai André Citroën 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/11] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states HERAKLES Rue de Touban Les Cinq Chemins 33185 Le Haillan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOUDON, Jean-Philippe 8 allée des Cavaliers SCI Fragonard Bâtiment 7 F-94700 Maisons-Alfort / FR | 02 /
YVART, Pierre 52 rue Maurice Ravel F-91610 Ballancourt-Sur-Essonne / FR | 03 /
MANTELET, Fabrice 5 rue Rousselet F-75007 Paris / FR | 04 /
LESAGE, Frédéric 10 rue des Violettes F-91200 Athis-Mons / FR | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13818261.3 | 09.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013FR52991 | Priority number, date | FR20120061946 | 12.12.2012 Original published format: FR 1261946 | [2015/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014091127 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2931653 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/06, C06B47/10 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
C01B3/065 (EP,US);
C01B3/0031 (US);
B01J19/24 (US);
C01B3/02 (US);
C06D5/06 (EP,US);
H01M8/0606 (US);
B01J2219/24 (US);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/82 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (US);
H01M2250/30 (US);
Y02B90/10 (US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | PYROTECHNISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM WASSERSTOFF UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2015/43] | English: | PYROTECHNIC PROCESS FOR PROVIDING VERY HIGHLY PURE HYDROGEN AND ASSOCIATED DEVICE | [2015/43] | French: | PROCEDE PYROTECHNIQUE DE MISE A DISPOSITION D'HYDROGENE DE TRES GRANDE PURETE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE. | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2016 | 31.12.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]FR2906805 (SNPE MATERIAUX ENERGETIQUES SA [FR]) [I] 1,6,8,9,11-14 * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 20; figure 1; example 1 * [Y] 10,15-22; | [IY]US2007084879 (MCLEAN GERARD F [CA], et al) [I] 1-8,11-14 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0116]; table 1 * [Y] 15-22; | [Y]US2007065689 (EDLUND DAVID J [US]) [Y] 15-22 * paragraphs [0027] , [0045]; figure 6 *; | [Y]FR2930245 (SNPE MATERIAUX ENERGETIQUES SA [FR]) [Y] 10 * claim 1 * | [Y] - Peter Häussinger ET AL, "Hydrogen, 3. Purification", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Weinheim, Germany, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, (20111015), doi:10.1002/14356007.o13_o04, ISBN 978-3-52-730673-2, XP055070696 [Y] 15-22 * page 329 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.o13_o04 | by applicant | EP1249427 | EP1405823 | EP1405824 | EP1496035 | EP2265545 | FR2906805 | WO2006067156 | FR2790751 | US2007084879 | - "Palladium-based alloy membranes for séparation of high purity hydrogen from hydrogen containing gas mixture", PLATINUM METAL REV., (2011), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 3 - 12 | - "Hydrogen, 3. Purification", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (20111015), vol. 18, pages 309 - 333 |