EP2909814 - DISPENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Custom S.p.A. Via Berettine, 2/B 43010 Fontevivo (Parma) / IT | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPANINI, Alberto Fraz. Tabiano 70 I-43036 Fidenza (Parma) / IT | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Villanova, Massimo, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [2020/38] |
Former [2015/35] | Villanova, Massimo, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 13818384.3 | 16.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013IB59398 | Priority number, date | IT2012MO00252 | 18.10.2012 Original published format: IT MO20120252 | [2015/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014060967 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2909814 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2909814 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G07B5/02, G07B3/02, B65H35/00, B26F3/00 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
B26F3/002 (EP,US);
G07B5/02 (EP,RU,US);
B65H35/008 (US);
B65H35/0006 (EP,US);
B65H2515/31 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1936 (EP,US);
G07B3/02 (EP,US);
G07B5/08 (US);
Y10T225/10 (EP,US);
Y10T225/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDERVORRICHTUNG | [2015/35] | English: | DISPENSING APPARATUS | [2015/35] | French: | APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2013 | AL | 16.09.2020 | AT | 16.09.2020 | CY | 16.09.2020 | CZ | 16.09.2020 | DK | 16.09.2020 | EE | 16.09.2020 | ES | 16.09.2020 | FI | 16.09.2020 | HR | 16.09.2020 | IT | 16.09.2020 | LT | 16.09.2020 | LV | 16.09.2020 | MC | 16.09.2020 | MK | 16.09.2020 | MT | 16.09.2020 | NL | 16.09.2020 | PL | 16.09.2020 | RO | 16.09.2020 | RS | 16.09.2020 | SE | 16.09.2020 | SI | 16.09.2020 | SK | 16.09.2020 | SM | 16.09.2020 | TR | 16.09.2020 | IE | 16.10.2020 | LU | 16.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | FR | 16.11.2020 | BG | 16.12.2020 | GB | 16.12.2020 | NO | 16.12.2020 | GR | 17.12.2020 | IS | 16.01.2021 | PT | 18.01.2021 | DE | 01.05.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.10.2013 | |
AL | 16.09.2020 | ||
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CY | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
MT | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
TR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
IT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
IE | 16.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
DK | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SI | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
DE | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
MC | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
LU | 16.10.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SK | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 16.09.2020 | |
AT | 16.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
ES | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
PL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
IS | 16.01.2021 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 16.09.2020 | |
CZ | 16.09.2020 | ||
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
SM | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 16.09.2020 | |
EE | 16.09.2020 | ||
FI | 16.09.2020 | ||
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RO | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
PT | 18.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LT | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
NL | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
HR | 16.09.2020 | ||
LV | 16.09.2020 | ||
RS | 16.09.2020 | ||
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
GR | 17.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
SE | 16.09.2020 | ||
BG | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 16.09.2020 | |
NO | 16.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2663369 (ERHARDT OSCAR P) [A] 9,10 * figures 1-7 * * column 5, lines 4-45 *; | [A]US5407115 (BLALOCK DOLAN F [US], et al) [A] 1-7,13-15 * abstract * * column 5, lines 42-48 *; | [Y]FR2796055 (ASCOM MONETEL SA [FR]) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * page 5, lines 8-19 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 20 *; | [A]WO0137223 (AXIOHM [FR], et al) [A] 8,9 * abstract ** page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 28 *; | [Y]US2006072953 (VIENNEAU DANIEL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] - [0056] - [0061] *; | [A]US2006210344 (MONTAGUTELLI DENIS [FR]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] * | by applicant | US2006210344 |