EP2935397 - INTERFACIAL PROCESSES FOR PREPARING PHOTOACTIVE ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYBERT, Paul Dean 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 02 /
MORIZUR, Jean-Francois 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 03 /
LAKE, Derek 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 04 /
HOOVER, James Franklin 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13819156.4 | 20.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US77024 | Priority number, date | US201261740062P | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740062 P | US201361791886P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361791886 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014100635 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2935397 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/14, C08G64/24 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C08G64/14 (EP,US);
C08G64/28 (US);
C08G63/00 (US);
C08G64/24 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLENVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LICHTAKTIVEN ADDITIVEN | [2015/44] | English: | INTERFACIAL PROCESSES FOR PREPARING PHOTOACTIVE ADDITIVES | [2015/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS INTERFACIAUX DE PRÉPARATION D'ADDITIFS PHOTOACTIFS | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 20.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2017 | Request for further processing for: | 20.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2016 | Decision despatched | 20.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4153780 (NARITA YOSHIHIRO, et al) [X] 1-18 * example 7 * [I] 19-53; | [A]EP1359176 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-53* the whole document * | Examination | EP1359176 | by applicant | US3516968 | US7112644 | US7244804 |