EP2872166 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING, TREATING AND PREVENTING DISEASES AND DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2021/16] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESIR, Gary 11 Zak Hill Drive Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2021/36] |
Former [2015/21] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13819705.8 | 16.07.2013 | [2021/36] | WO2013US50660 | Priority number, date | US201261671826P | 16.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671826 P | US201361750916P | 10.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361750916 P | US201361813778P | 19.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361813778 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014014899 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872166 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2872166 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/44, A61P9/00, A61P13/00 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61K38/44 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/75 (US);
C12Q2600/118 (US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
C12Y106/03 (EP,US);
G01N2333/90209 (US);
G01N2333/90633 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | A61K38/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG, BEHANDLUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON ERKRANKUNGEN UND STÖRUNGEN | [2015/21] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING, TREATING AND PREVENTING DISEASES AND DISORDERS | [2015/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER, TRAITER ET PRÉVENIR DES MALADIES ET AFFECTIONS | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 08.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2013 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | MT | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | TR | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
TR | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007059357 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * * sequence 2 * * page 112, lines 15-27 * * example 4 * * claims 1,2,11-15 * [Y] 1-6,9-12; | [XY] - XU J ET AL, "Renalase is a novel, soluble monoamine oxidase that regulates cardiac function and blood pressure", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20050501), vol. 115, no. 5, doi:10.1172/JCI200524066, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1275 - 1280, XP003013119 [X] 9-11 * abstract * * page 1276, column 4 * * page 1277, column 1 * * page 1278, column 6; table 1 * * page 1279, columns 7,12,14 * * page 1280, column 1 * [Y] 1-6,9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200524066 | International search | [A]US2009181380 (BELOUCHI ABDELMAJID [CA], et al); | [X]US2010136651 (XU JIANCHAO [US], et al); | [A]US2012178914 (HENDERSON LEE A [US], et al); | [A] - DESIR, "Regulation of blood pressure and cardiovascular function by renalase", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, vol. 76, pages 366 - 370, XP055184546 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ki.2009.169 | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4965188 | US5023243 | US5168053 | US5190931 | US6156501 | WO2007059357 | US2010136651 | - XU J et al., J Clin Invest, (20050000), vol. 115, no. 5, pages 1275 - 1280 | - DESIR, Pediatr Nephrol, (20120000), vol. 27, pages 719 - 725 | - SCHLAICH, J Am Soc Nephrol, (20090000), vol. 20, pages 933 - 939 | - KIM et al., Kidney Int, (20090000), vol. 75, pages 809 - 823 | - DESIR, Curr Opin Nephrol Hypertens, (20110000), vol. 20, pages 31 - 36 | - LI et al., Circulation, (20080000), vol. 117, pages 1277 - 1282 | - GRISANTI et al., J Pharmacol Exp Ther, (20110000), vol. 338, pages 648 - 657 | - MIKSA et al., PLoS One, (20090000), vol. 4, page e5504 | - KAYSENEISERICH, Semin Dial, (20030000), vol. 16, pages 438 - 446 | - WU et al., Kidney Int, (20110000), vol. 79, pages 853 - 860 | - CHERTOW et al., J Am Soc Nephrol, (20050000), vol. 16, pages 3365 - 3370 | - BOVE et al., J Cardiothorac Vase Anesth, (20040000), vol. 18, pages 442 - 445 | - ELAPAVALURUKELLUM, Acta Clin Belg Suppl, (20070000), pages 326 - 331 | - JONESLEE, Best Pract Res Clin Anaesthesiol, (20080000), vol. 22, pages 193 - 208 | - JO et al., Clin J Am Soc Nephrol, (20070000), vol. 2, pages 356 - 365 | - HAMPEL et al., Biochemistry, (19890000), vol. 28, page 4929 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 5879 - 5883 | - ALBERT L. LEHNINGER, Principles of Biochemistry, Worth Pub, (19820000), pages 793 - 800 | - DESIR et al., J. of the Am. Heart Assn, (20120000), vol. 1, no. 4, page e002634 | - MARCUS-SEKURA, Anal. Biochem., (19880000), vol. 172, page 289 | - CECH et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19920000), vol. 267, page 17479 | - CECH, J. Amer. Med. Assn, (19880000), vol. 260, page 3030 | - XU et al., Clin Invest, (20050000), vol. 115, pages 1275 - 1280 | - CECH, J. Amer. Med. Assn., (19880000), vol. 260, page 3030 | - OKUSA, Contrib Nephrol, (20100000), vol. 165, pages 153 - 158 | - PALADINO et al., Microvasc Res, (20090000), vol. 77, pages 8 - 12 | - PARK et al., Lab Invest, (20110000), vol. 91, pages 63 - 84 | - LEMAY et al., Transplantation, (20000000), vol. 69, pages 959 - 963 | - WANG et al., Biochim Biophys Acta, (20000000), vol. 1535, pages 36 - 44 | - KOO et al., Int J Mol Med, (20000000), vol. 5, pages 457 - 465 | - YANG et al., Am J Physiol Gastrointest Liver Physiol, (20000000), vol. 279, pages G1274 - G1281 | - ZHOU et al., Biochim Biophys Acta, (20040000), vol. 1689, pages 212 - 218 | - YANG et al., Am J Physiol Gastrointest Liver Physiol, (20010000), vol. 281, pages G1014 - G1021 | - ZHOU et al., Biochim Biophys Acta, (20010000), vol. 1537, pages 49 - 57 | - KIM et al., Am J Physiol Renal Physiol, (20100000), vol. 299, no. 2, pages F347 - 58 | - SLOT, J Clin Lab Invest, (19650000), vol. 17, pages 381 - 387 | - JABLONSKI et al., Transplantation, (19830000), vol. 35, pages 198 - 204 | - LEE et al., J Am Soc Nephrol, (20040000), vol. 15, pages 102 - 111 | - LEE et al., Am J Physiol Renal Physiol, (20040000), vol. 286, pages F298 - F306 | - KIM et al., Am J Nephrol, (20100000), vol. 31, pages 353 - 362 | - ARANYSAFIRSTEIN, Semin Nephrol, (20030000), vol. 23, pages 460 - 464 | - SAFIRSTEIN, Int Suppl, (20040000), pages S62 - 66 | - ARANY et al., Kidney Int., (20040000), vol. 65, pages 1231 - 1239 | - ARANY et al., American Journal of Physiology: Renal Physiology, (20040000), vol. 287, pages F543 - 549 | - PABLADONG, Kidney Int, (20080000), vol. 73, pages 994 - 1007 | - DESIR et al., J Am Heart Assoc, (20120000), vol. 1, page e002634 | - LEE et al., American journal of physiology. Renal physiology, (20040000), vol. 286, pages F298 - 306 | - LEE et al., J Am Soc Nephrol, (20130000), vol. 24, pages 445 - 455 | - LEEEMALA, American journal of physiology. Renal physiology, (20020000), vol. 282, pages F844 - 852 | - HENNEBRY, Mol Psychiatry, (20100000), vol. 15, pages 234 - 236 | - MILANI et al., J Mol Biol, (20110000), vol. 411, pages 463 - 473 | - KYRIAKIS et al., Physiological Reviews, (20120000), vol. 92, pages 689 - 737 | - BONVENTREYANG, The Journal of Clinical Investigation, (20110000), vol. 121, pages 4210 - 4221 | - WANG et al., Hypertension, (20120000), vol. 60 |