EP2874919 - CONVEYOR BELT INCLUDING CHOCKING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laitram, L.L.C. 200 Laitram Lane Harahan, LA 70123 / US | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Soren A. 53 Eggers Ct. Summit, NJ 07901 / US | 02 /
KOVACH, Miranda R. 804 Audubon Trace Jefferson, Louisiana 70121 / US | 03 /
DAILEY, R. Scott 51 Belle Grove Drive Destrehan, Louisiana 70047 / US | 04 /
WENZEL, John E. 235 Deval Drive Mandeville, Louisiana 70471 / US | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13820577.8 | 10.07.2013 | WO2013US49842 | Priority number, date | US201261673036P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673036 P | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014014716 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874919 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/58, B62D65/18, B60S3/04, B65G15/42, B65G15/44, B65G17/08 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
B65G15/44 (EP,CN,US);
B65G17/46 (US);
B65G15/42 (EP,US);
B65G17/08 (EP,CN,US);
B65G47/66 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | B65G15/58, B62D65/18, B60S3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Title | German: | FÖRDERBAND MIT EINEM BREMSMODUL | [2015/22] | English: | CONVEYOR BELT INCLUDING CHOCKING MODULE | [2015/22] | French: | BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE COMPRENANT UN MODULE DE CALAGE | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 28.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2019 | 11.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/47] | 28.06.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR2415063 (LAITRAM CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 9-15 [I] 6,7; | [XI]US4832183 (LAPEYRE JAMES M [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [I] 6-10; | [XI]JPH1025015 (CENTRAL MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *[I] 3-15; | [XY]US2006076218 (MARSHALL ANGELA L [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 9-15; | [X]EP1828031 (LAITRAM LLC [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2012043184 (MARSHALL ANGELA L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-9 * | International search | [A]US4911286 (HERZKE HARRY [DE]); | [Y]JPH1025015 (CENTRAL MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US2004178049 (HERTZ ROGER B [CA], et al); | [Y]US2006076218 (MARSHALL ANGELA L [US], et al); | [A]JP2010149981 (DAIO SEISHI KK) |