EP2932692 - COMPATIBLY EXTENDING OFFLOAD TOKEN SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Dustin, L. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13821245.1 | 14.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US75212 | Priority number, date | US201213714413 | 14.12.2012 Original published format: US201213714413 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093952 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932692 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2932692 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, G06F3/06, G06F21/60, H04L29/06, G06F17/30 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
H04L67/06 (EP,RU,US);
G06F16/24 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/0611 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/0655 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/0673 (EP,RU,US);
H04L67/08 (EP,RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | H04L29/08, G06F3/06, G06F21/60, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPATIBLE ERWEITERUNG EINER ENTLADUNGS-TOKENGRÖSSE | [2015/43] | English: | COMPATIBLY EXTENDING OFFLOAD TOKEN SIZE | [2015/43] | French: | EXTENSION DE MANIÈRE COMPATIBLE D'UNE TAILLE DE JETON DE DÉLESTAGE | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 03.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2013 | AL | 01.02.2017 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | IT | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | RS | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 14.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 14.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US8042163 (KARR RONALD S [US], et al); | [I]US2012079583 (CHRISTIANSEN NEAL R [US], et al) |