EP2935601 - RECOMBINANT MICROBIAL CELLS THAT PRODUCE AT LEAST 28% EICOSAPENTAENOIC ACID AS DRY CELL WEIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company Chestnut Run Plaza 974 Center Road P.O. Box 2915 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | [2016/02] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Quinn, Qun 544 Revere Road West Chester, Pennsylvania 19382 / US | 02 /
HONG, Seung-Pyo 9 Pierson's Ridge Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 03 /
SHARPE, Pamela, L. 232 Cayman Court Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | 04 /
YADAV, Narendra, S. 126 Tuckaway Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 05 /
FAN, Xiaochun 175 Pratt Lane West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 06 /
DAUNER, Michael 36 Stonebridge Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | [2018/12] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
ZHU, Quinn, Qun 544 Revere Road West Chester, Pennsylvania 19382 / US | ||
02 /
HONG, Seung-Pyo 9 Pierson's Ridge Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | |||
03 /
SHARPE, Pamela, L. 232 Cayman Court Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | |||
04 /
YADAV, Narendra, S. 126 Tuckaway Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | |||
05 /
FAN, Xiaochun 2221-D Prior R Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | |||
06 /
DAUNER, Michael 36 Stonebridge Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13821271.7 | 18.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US75896 | Priority number, date | US201261740502P | 21.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740502 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014100062 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2935601 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2935601 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, C12N9/10 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C12P7/6432 (EP,US);
C12N1/16 (US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
C12P7/6431 (EP,US);
C12P7/6463 (EP,US);
C12P7/6472 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE MIKROBIELLE ZELLEN, DIE MINDESTENS 28% EICOSAPENTAENSÄURE ALS TROCKENZELLGEWICHT ERZEUGEN | [2015/44] | English: | RECOMBINANT MICROBIAL CELLS THAT PRODUCE AT LEAST 28% EICOSAPENTAENOIC ACID AS DRY CELL WEIGHT | [2015/44] | French: | CELLULES MICROBIENNES RECOMBINANTES QUI PRODUISENT AU MOINS 28 % D'ACIDE EICOSAPENTAÉNOÏQUE EN POIDS DE CELLULES SÈCHES | [2015/44] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2013 | AL | 21.03.2018 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | RS | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | IE | 18.12.2018 | LU | 18.12.2018 | MT | 18.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.12.2013 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MK | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
MT | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
MT | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
MT | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2010317072 (HONG SEUNG-PYO [US], et al); | [AD]US2012052537 (HONG SEUNG-PYO [US], et al) | Examination | WO2013192002 |