Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9790475 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2017 | B2 | US2016076011 | 17.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP77227 | 18.12.2013 | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10364419 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2019 | B2 | US2019169581 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514758339 | 29.06.2015 | WO2013EP77227 | 18.12.2013 | US201715714444 | 25.09.2017 | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016508143 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP77227 | 18.12.2013 | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013372004B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2017 | B2 | AU2013372004 | 16.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP77227 | 18.12.2013 | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2941439 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B1 | EP2941439 | 11.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP77227 | 18.12.2013 | EP13821463 | 18.12.2013 | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2896962 | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP77227 | 18.12.2013 | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1215441 | 26.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP77227 | 18.12.2013 | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014106583 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2752426 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13150171 | 03.01.2013 |