EP2938656 - MOLECULARLY IMPRINTED POLYMERS OF SOL-GEL TYPE AND THEIR USE AS ANTIDANDRUFF AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, TR | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREAVES, Andrew 30 rue du Sinot F-77700 Magny-le-Hongre / FR | 02 /
RIBAUD, Christèle 3 avenue Victor Hugo F-94130 Nogent S/Marne / FR | 03 /
MANFRE, Franco 6 rue des Parclains F-94170 Le Perreux Sur Marne / FR | 04 /
HAUPT, Karsten Université de Technologie de Compiègne UMR CNRS 6022 Génie Enzymatique et Cellulaire Rue Personne de Roberval F-60205 Compiègne / FR | 05 /
TSE SUM BUI, Jeanne Bernadette Université de Technologie de Compiègne UMR CNRS 6022 Génie Enzymatique et Cellulaire Rue Personne de Roberval F-60205 Compiègne / FR | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Rivière, François Armand L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [2016/34] |
Former [2015/45] | Rivière, François Armand L'Oreal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnieres-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13821474.7 | 20.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013EP77790 | Priority number, date | FR20120062784 | 26.12.2012 Original published format: FR 1262784 | US201361773185P | 06.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361773185 P | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014102209 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938656 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2938656 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/26, A61Q5/00, A61K8/898, C08G77/32 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q5/006 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOLEKULAR GEPRÄGTE POLYMERE VOM SOL-GEL-TYP UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTISCHUPPENMITTEL | [2015/45] | English: | MOLECULARLY IMPRINTED POLYMERS OF SOL-GEL TYPE AND THEIR USE AS ANTIDANDRUFF AGENT | [2015/45] | French: | POLYMÈRES À EMPREINTES MOLÉCULAIRES DE TYPE SOL-GEL ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENT ANTIPELLICULAIRE | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 16.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2013 | AL | 24.08.2016 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IE | 20.12.2016 | LU | 20.12.2016 | MT | 20.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 20.12.2013 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
MT | 20.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.12.2013 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010048737 (WENDEL VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0098] , [0155]; claim - *; | [A] - ZHEN-JUAN DUAN ET AL, "Novel surface molecularly imprinted solâ gel polymer applied to the online solid phase extraction of methyl-3-quinoxaline-2-carboxylic acid and quinoxaline-2-carboxylic acid from pork muscle", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20110821), vol. 401, no. 7, doi:10.1007/S00216-011-5329-0, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 2291 - 2299, XP019953572 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2293 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-011-5329-0 | [A] - M. E. Díaz-García ET AL, "MOLECULARLY IMPRINTED POLYMERS", Encyclopedia of Analytical Science (Second Edition), Elsevier, (20050525), pages 172 - 182, doi:10.1016/B0-12-369397-7/00700-7, ISBN 978-0-12-369397-6, XP055000717 [A] 1-11 * page 179, "Sol-Gel Molecular Imprinting" * * page 180, "Applications of Molecularly Imprinted Materials" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B0-12-369397-7/00700-7 | [A] - DEANGELIS YVONNE M ET AL, "Three etiologic facets of dandruff and seborrheic dermatitis: Malassezia fungi, sebaceous lipids, and individual sensitivity", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200512), Database accession no. PREV200600189798, XP002715332 [A] 12-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1087-0024.2005.10119.x | [ ] - JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, (200512), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1087-0024, pages 295 - 297 | by applicant | - THE ANTISEPTIC, (2004), vol. 201, no. 1, pages 5 - 8 | - Y.M. DEANGELIS ET AL., "Three Etiologic Facets of Dandruff and Seborrheic Dermatitis: Malassezia Fungi, Sebaceous Lipids, and Individual Sensitivity", J. INVESTIG. DERMATOL. SYMP. PROC., (2005), vol. 10, pages 295 - 297 | - J. MOL. RECOGNIT., (2006), vol. 19, pages 106 - 180 | - ADVANCES IN CARBOHYDRATE CHEMISTRY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), pages 1 - 20 | - "Molecularly imprinted polymers: the next generation", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 75, no. 17, pages 376 - 383 | - "Selective separation of basic and reactive dyes by molecularly imprinted polymers (MIPs", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (2009), vol. 149, no. 1-3, pages 263 - 272 | - B.R. HART; K.J. SHEA, MOLECULARLY IMPRINTED POLYMERS, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/0471216275.esm054/full | - M. LASAKOVA; P. JANDERA, J. SEP. SCI., vol. 32, pages 799 - 812 | - "Catalysts and the structure of Si02 sol-gel films", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 35, pages 1835 - 184 | - "Sol-gel processing of silica: II. The role of the catalyst", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (19861002), vol. 87, no. 1-2, pages 185 - 198 |