EP2938358 - ANTI-LAMP1 ANTIBODIES AND ANTIBODY DRUG CONJUGATES, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUDAT, Yves c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
BLANCHE, Francis c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
CAMERON, Béatrice c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 04 /
DABDOUBI, Tarik c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 05 /
LEFEBVRE, Anne-Marie c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 06 /
MATHIEU, Magali c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 07 /
MERINO-TRIGO, Ana c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | 08 /
NUNES, Manoel c/o Sanofi Patent Department 54 rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Bouvet, Philippe, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 13821489.5 | 26.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013EP78017 | Priority number, date | EP20120306691 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12306691 | EP20120306694 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12306694 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014102299 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2938358 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C12Q1/68, C07K16/28, A61K47/48 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
A61K47/68033 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,US);
A61K47/6855 (US);
A61K47/6857 (US);
A61K47/6863 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (US);
C07K16/3023 (US);
C07K16/3046 (US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/732 (US);
C07K2317/77 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | ANTI-LAMP1-ANTIKÖRPER UND ANTIKÖRPERARZNEIMITTELKONJUGATE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2015/45] | English: | ANTI-LAMP1 ANTIBODIES AND ANTIBODY DRUG CONJUGATES, AND USES THEREOF | [2015/45] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-LAMP1 ET CONJUGUÉS ANTICORPS MÉDICAMENT, ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 16.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Divisional application(s) | EP18175369.0 / EP3400961 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004048537 (EXELIXIS INC [US], et al); | [XAYI]WO2005012912 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2011123554 (OSTERROTH FRANK [DE], et al); |