EP2917396 - OSCILLATION DAMPER FOR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH ROTATING DRUM, AND HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE COMPRISING THE DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRACIA BOBED, Ismael La Alberca, 3, Casa 1 E-50194 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
LATRE ABADIA, Roberto Manuel Viola, 9-4ºC E-50014 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
MARTINEZ PEREZ, Gerardo Margarita Nelken, 4-4ª-4º E-50015 Zaragoza / ES | 04 /
RECIO FERRER, Eduardo Bubierca, 6-5ºDcha. E-50013 Zaragoza / ES | [2016/34] |
Former [2015/38] | 01 /
GRACIA BOBED, Ismael La Alberca 3 Casa 1 E-50194 Zaragoza / ES | ||
02 /
LATRE ABADIA, Roberto Manuel Viola 9-4ºC E-50014 Zaragoza / ES | |||
03 /
MARTINEZ PEREZ, Gerardo Margarita Nelken 4-4ª-4º E-50015 Zaragoza / ES | |||
04 /
RECIO FERRER, Eduardo Bubierca 6-5ºDcha. E-50013 Zaragoza / ES | Application number, filing date | 13821971.2 | 24.10.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013IB59598 | Priority number, date | ES20120031712 | 09.11.2012 Original published format: ES 201231712 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014072860 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2917396 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2917396 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/22 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
D06F37/22 (EP,CN,ES,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER FÜR EINE HAUSHALTSVORRICHTUNG MIT ROTIERENDER TROMMEL UND HAUSHALTSVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM DÄMPFER | [2015/38] | English: | OSCILLATION DAMPER FOR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH ROTATING DRUM, AND HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE COMPRISING THE DAMPER | [2015/38] | French: | AMORTISSEUR D'OSCILLATION POUR APPLICATION DOMESTIQUE AYANT UN TAMBOUR TOURNANT ET APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER COMPRENANT L'AMORTISSEUR | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 11.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2013 | AL | 24.08.2016 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | IE | 24.10.2016 | LU | 24.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/35] | HU | 24.10.2013 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 24.10.2013 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.10.2013 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]AT218995B (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-5,10,11,13,15 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 23; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE1460968 (HOTCHKISS BRANDT) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2011070092 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [YD] 1-5,10,11,13,15 * page 3, line 12 - page 7, line 118 * * page 5, line 15 - page 7, line 6; figures 3,5,6 *; | [Y]WO2012069987 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,10,11,13,15* page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 16; figures 3,5,6 * | by applicant | EP1754908 | WO2011070092 |