EP2877163 - FORMULATIONS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING FORMULATIONS FOR USE IN COLONIC EVACUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redhill Biopharma Ltd. 21 Ha'arba'a Street Tel-Aviv, 64739 / IL | [2018/45] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Redhill Biopharma Ltd 21 Ha'arbaa Street 64739 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FATHI, Reza 260 Forest Avenue Oradell, NJ 07649 / US | 02 /
MCLEAN, Patrick, Laughlin 911/3480 Rue Simpson Montreal, QC H3G 2N7 / CA | [2019/12] |
Former [2015/23] | 01 /
FATHI, Reza 88 North Franklin Turnpike Hohokus, NJ 07423 / US | ||
02 /
MCLEAN, Patrick, Laughlin 911/3480 Rue Simpson Montreal, QC H3G 2N7 / CA | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13822195.7 | 26.07.2013 | [2019/12] | WO2013IB01640 | Priority number, date | US201261676608P | 27.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261676608 P | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014016671 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2877163 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877163 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/375, A61K31/185, A61K31/4402, A61K33/08, A61K9/20, A61K9/26, A61K9/28, A61P1/10 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/4402 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/185 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2077 (IL,KR);
A61K31/375 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K33/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2009 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/28 (IL,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/08, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/50] | A61K31/375, A61K31/185, A61K31/4402, A61K33/08, A61K9/20, A61K9/26, A61K9/28 | ||
Former IPC [2015/23] | A61K9/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | 20.02.2015 | ME | 20.02.2015 | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER DICKDARMENTLEERUNG | [2015/23] | English: | FORMULATIONS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING FORMULATIONS FOR USE IN COLONIC EVACUATION | [2015/23] | French: | FORMULATIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE FORMULATIONS DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES EN ÉVACUATION DU CÔLON | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 19.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | LU | 26.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2020/27] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 26.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | LV | 20.03.2019 | |
RS | 20.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3459863 (APELIAN HENRY M, et al) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 9-18 *; | [Y]US5631022 (MANDEL KENNETH G [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example 4 *; | [Y]US2005089563 (DAGGY BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * [0054]-[0056] *; | [A] - M M TAQUI KHAN ET AL, "Metal Ion and Metal Chelate Catalyzed Oxidation of Ascorbic Acid by Molecular Oxygen. I. Cupric and Ferric Ion Catalyzed Oxidation''2", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19670802), pages 4176 - 4185, XP055224929 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5631022 (MANDEL KENNETH G [US], et al); | [Y]US6132767 (BORODY THOMAS JULIUS [AU], et al); | [Y]US6475510 (VENKATESH GOPADI M [US], et al) | by applicant | US5631022 |