EP2878672 - FUSION GENE OF CEP55 GENE AND RET GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Cancer Center 5-1-1, Tsukiji Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040045 / JP | For all designated states LSIP, LLC 7-12, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBATA, Tatsuhiro c/o National Cancer Center 5-1-1 Tsukiji Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 02 /
HOSODA, Fumie c/o National Cancer Center 5-1-1 Tsukiji Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13822713.7 | 23.07.2013 | WO2013JP69929 | Priority number, date | JP20120165694 | 26.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012165694 | [2015/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014017491 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2878672 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, A61K45/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07K14/47, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/574 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/5748 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
C07K14/82 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (US);
C12N9/12 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Y207/10001 (EP,US);
G01N33/57446 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Title | German: | FUSIONSGEN VON CEP55-GEN UND RET-GEN | [2015/23] | English: | FUSION GENE OF CEP55 GENE AND RET GENE | [2015/23] | French: | GÈNE DE FUSION FORMÉ PAR LE GÈNE CEP55 ET LE GÈNE RET | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2015 | Translation filed | 24.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 05.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005222029 (BARTEL PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0084] * [Y] 1-8; | [XY]WO2012014795 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-5 * [Y] 1-8; | [XY] - DORON LIPSON ET AL, "Identification of new ALK and RET gene fusions from colorectal and lung cancer biopsies", NATURE MEDICINE, (20120212), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1038/nm.2673, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 382 - 384, XP055145920 [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2673 | [XY] - DORON LIPSON ET AL, "Identification of new ALK and RET gene fusions from colorectal and lung cancer biopsies - Supplementary information", NATURE MEDICINE., US, (20120212), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1038/nm.2673, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 382 - 384, XP055239624 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2673 | [XY] - JHIANG S M, "THE RET PROTO-ONCOGENE IN HUMAN CANCERS", ONCOGENE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20001120), vol. 19, no. 49, doi:10.1038/SJ.ONC.1203857, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 5590 - 5597, XP009002874 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1203857 | [XY] - R CORVI ET AL, "RET/PCM-1: a novel fusion gene in papillary thyroid carcinoma", ONCOGENE, (20000101), vol. 19, no. 37, doi:10.1038/sj.onc.1203772, pages 4236 - 4242, XP055239558 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1203772 | [T] - R. WANG ET AL, "RET Fusions Define a Unique Molecular and Clinicopathologic Subtype of Non-Small-Cell Lung Cancer", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, US, (20121113), vol. 30, no. 35, doi:10.1200/JCO.2012.44.1477, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 4352 - 4359, XP055239259 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2012.44.1477 | [T] - NICOLAS STRANSKY ET AL, "The landscape of kinase fusions in cancer", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140910), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms5846, page 4846, XP055223951 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5846 | International search | [X] - MASANORI FUJII ET AL., "Haigan to oncogene addiction", MOLECULAR TARGETED THERAPY FOR CANCER, (20120701), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 201 - 209, XP008176525 | [A] - KUNIEDA TETSUO ET AL., "Cloning of an activated human ret gene with a novel 5' sequence fused by DNA rearrangement.", GENE, (1991), vol. 107, no. 2, pages 323 - 328, XP055190527 | [A] - DE VRIES ET AL., "RET/PTC rearrangement is prevalent in follicular Hurthle cell carcinomas.", HISTOPATHOLOGY, (201211), vol. 61, no. 5, pages 833 - 843, XP055190537 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2559.2012.04276.x | [A] - KOHNO TAKASHI ET AL., "KIF5B-RET fusions in lung adenocarcinoma.", NATURE MEDICINE, (201202), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 375 - 377, XP055145929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2644 | [A] - CHANG, YU-CHEN ET AL., "CENTROSOMAL PROTEIN 55 (CEP55) STABILITY IS NEGATIVELY REGULATED BY P53 PROTEIN THROUGH POLO-LIKE KINASE 1 (PLK1).", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (201202), vol. 287, no. 6, pages 4376 - 4385, XP055190540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M111.289108 | [A] - SHIRAISHI TAKUMI ET AL., "Cancer/Testis Antigens as potential predictors of biochemical recurrence of prostate cancer following radical prostatectomy.", JOURNAL OF TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, (2011), vol. 9, pages 153 (1 - 9), XP021110781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-5876-9-153 | by applicant | - KOUVARAKI MA. ET AL., THYROID, (2005), vol. 15, pages 531 - 544 | - NIKIFOROV YE. ET AL., NAT REV ENDOCRINOL., (2011), vol. 7, pages 569 - 580 | - TAKEUCHI K. ET AL., NAT MED., (2012), vol. 18, pages 378 - 381 | - KOHNO T. ET AL., NAT MED., (2012), vol. 18, pages 375 - 377 | - LIPSON D. ET AL., NAT MED., (2012), vol. 18, pages 382 - 384 | - ZHAO WM. ET AL., MOL BIOL CELL, (2006), vol. 17, pages 3881 - 3896 | - INODA S. ET AL., JIMMUNOTHER., (2009), vol. 32, pages 474 - 485 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - KOHNO T. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (20120212), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 375 - 377 |