EP2883546 - NEW DIFFERENTIAL-RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING THREE ACTIVE PRINCIPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landsteiner Scientific S.A. de C.V. Av. Periférico Sur n° 4118 Torre Zafiro I Piso 6 Colonia Jardines del Pedregal 01900 Distrito Federal / MX | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGAPITO PERALTA, Dario Calle Camino Real No. 27 Colonia San Antonio Buenavista C.P. 50266 Toluca Estado de México / MX | 02 /
MARTÍNEZ REYES, Julián Calle 6 Millones Mz. 85 Lt. 24 Colonia Ciudade Lago C.P. 57180 Nezahualcoyoti Estado de México / MX | 03 /
REYES MORENO, Carlos Alberto Hacienda Tejalpa No. 153 Colonia Fraccionamiento Santa Elena C.P. 51205 Toluca Estado de México / MX | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Covadonga Fernández-Vega Feijoo, Maria Fernández-Vega y Asociados Agencia de Propiedad Industrial, S.L. C/Bréton de los Herreros, 66 - 1° B 28003 Madrid / ES | [2021/36] |
Former [2015/25] | Covadonga Fernández-Vega Feijoo, Maria Fernández-Vega y Asociados C/ Carbonero y Sol, 42 A 28006 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13822895.2 | 22.07.2013 | [2021/36] | WO2013MX00092 | Priority number, date | MX20120008541 | 23.07.2012 Original published format: MX 2012008541 | [2015/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014017897 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | ES | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883546 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2883546 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K9/48, A61K31/4422, A61K31/4178, A61K31/549, A61K31/435, A61P9/12 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/549 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/435 (EP,US);
A61K31/4422 (EP,US);
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4178, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4422, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/549, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | A61K9/50, A61K9/48, A61K31/4422, A61K31/4178, A61K31/549, A61P9/12, A61K9/16, A61K31/435 | ||
Former IPC [2015/25] | A61K31/4178, A61K31/4422, A61K31/549, A61K9/24, A61P9/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2015/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 23.02.2015 | ME | 23.02.2015 | Title | German: | NEUE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DREI WIRKSTOFFEN MIT DIFFERENZIELLER FREISETZUNG | [2015/25] | English: | NEW DIFFERENTIAL-RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING THREE ACTIVE PRINCIPLES | [2015/25] | French: | NOUVELLE COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE À LIBÉRATION DIFFÉRENTIELLE CONTENANT TROIS PRINCIPES ACTIFS | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2015 | Translation filed | 23.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 23.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2015/25] | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 04.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.2018 | 31.07.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2019 | 31.07.2020 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2013 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | MT | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Karunanidhi, "Simultaneous Analysis of Losartan Potassium, Amlodipine Besylate, and Hydrochlorothiazide in Bulk and in Tablets by High-Performance Thin Layer Chromatography with UV-Absorption Densitometry", J Anal Methods Chem, (20120408), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3335319/, (20160412), XP055264827 [I] 1-10 * point 2.2 * | International search | [X]US2010143470 (KIM SUNG WUK [KR], et al); | [X]US2010047341 (KIM SUNG WUK [KR], et al); | [X]KR20090131472 ; | [A]WO03097045 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2009134956 (BLUE NOTE PHARMACEUTICALS INC) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2010-A38512, XP055190227 & KR20090131472 A 20091229 (SAM CHUN DANG PHARM CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2012055941 | MX2008016532 | MX198140 | - FOGARI R; ZOPPI A; DEROSA G; MUGELLINI A; LAZZARI P; RINALDI A ET AL., "Effect of valsartan addition to amlodipine on ankle oedema and subcutaneous tissue pressure in hypertensive patients", J HUM HYPERTENS, (2007), vol. 21, pages 220 - 4 | - MESSERLI FH., "Vasodilatory edema: a common side effect of antihypertensive therapy", CURR CARDIOL REPORTS, (2002), vol. 4, pages 479 - 82, XP009034237 | - CALHOUN DA; LACOURCIERE T; CHIANG YT; GLAZER RD, TRIPLE ANTIHYPERTENSIVE THERAPY WITH AMLODIPINE, VALSARTAN AND HYDROCHLOROTHIAZIDE: A RANDOMIZED CLINICAL TRIAL |