EP2878202 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DANISH DOUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Oil Company, Limited 1, Sumiyoshi-cho Izumisano-shi Osaka 598-8540 / JP | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANATANI, Hiroyuki c/o Fuji Oil Company, Limited Tsukuba R&D Center 4-3, Kinunodai Tsukubamirai-shi Ibaraki 300-2436 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Norifumi c/o Fuji Oil Company, Limited Tsukuba R&D Center 4-3, Kinunodai Tsukubamirai-shi Ibaraki 300-2436 / JP | 03 /
FUKUDA, Hirohisa c/o Fuji Oil Company, Limited Tsukuba R&D Center 4-3, Kinunodai Tsukubamirai-shi Ibaraki 300-2436 / JP | 04 /
IGA, Daihachi c/o Fuji Oil Company, Limited Tsukuba R&D Center 4-3, Kinunodai Tsukubamirai-shi Ibaraki 300-2436 / JP | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13823531.2 | 30.04.2013 | [2017/11] | WO2013JP62563 | Priority number, date | JP20120164524 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012164524 | [2015/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014017139 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2878202 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2878202 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/18, A21D2/22, A21D6/00 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
A21D2/18 (EP,CN,US);
A21D10/002 (CN,US);
A21D13/16 (EP,CN,US);
A21D2/22 (EP,CN,US);
A21D6/001 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEIGS FÜR KOPENHAGENER GEBÄCK | [2015/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING DANISH DOUGH | [2015/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PÂTE POUR PÂTISSERIES DANOISES | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | Translation filed | 25.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 06.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2013 | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | IE | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | LU | 30.04.2017 | MT | 30.04.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | GB | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | DE | 03.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.04.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 30.04.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 30.04.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.04.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
IE | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
MT | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GB | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
LU | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3803326 (CRAIG T, et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 24 * * claims 1,8 *; | [Y]EP0340355 (NUTRA PRODUCTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 4, line 52 - page 5, line 21 * * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]EP0922389 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1839487 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0028] , [0041] *; | [Y]JP2011092119 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [Y] 1-7* paragraphs [0023] , [0027] , [0032] *; | [E]EP2939548 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-7 * Comparative Examples 5 to 17 * | International search | [A]JPH01225438 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JPH0276531 (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO); | [Y]JPH057449 (FUJI OIL CO LTD, et al); | [Y] - YASUTAKA MIYOSHI, "Daizu no Riyo ni Kansuru Kenkyu (the 1st report) -Rhizopus oligosporus 8631 Kabu no Mannanase ni Tsuite", BULLETIN OF HIROSHIMA BUNKYO WOMEN'S COLLEGE, (1988), vol. 23, pages 37 - 46, XP008176247 | by applicant | JPH0339028 | JPH057449 | JPH104864 | JP2003092986 |