EP2899756 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Module Technology Co., Ltd. Leading venture plaza 75-1 Ono-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0046 / JP | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARAZONO, Fumikazu 652-39, Sugeta-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0864 / JP | [2016/07] |
Former [2015/31] | 01 /
HARAZONO, Fumikazu 652-39 Sugeta-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0864 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 13823908.2 | 30.08.2013 | WO2013JP73335 | Priority number, date | JP20120205618 | 19.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012205618 | [2015/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014045842 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899756 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/07, H01L25/18, H01L23/433, H01L23/31, H01L23/495, H01L23/498, H01L23/00, H01L29/78 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
H01L25/18 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (US);
H01L23/3675 (US);
H01L23/4334 (EP,US);
H01L23/49524 (EP,US);
H01L23/49534 (EP,US);
H01L23/49562 (EP,US);
H01L23/49575 (EP,US);
H01L23/49844 (EP,US);
H01L23/528 (US);
H01L24/40 (EP);
H01L24/41 (EP);
H01L25/074 (EP);
H01L29/7395 (US);
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/7827 (EP,US);
H01L29/861 (US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP);
H01L2224/26175 (EP,US);
H01L2224/291 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29294 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29339 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/33181 (EP,US);
H01L2224/37147 (EP);
H01L2224/40095 (EP);
H01L2224/8314 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83801 (EP);
H01L2224/8384 (EP);
H01L23/3128 (EP,US);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L23/49838 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/37 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/1305 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/291, H01L2924/014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29294, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29339, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/37147, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/84 (EP);
H01L2924/13055, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2015/31] | H01L25/07, H01L25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2015/31] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2015/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2014 | Translation filed | 25.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 10.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007241393 (HAUENSTEIN HENNING [US]) [A] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063]; figure 9 *; | [A]WO2009020061 (ROHM CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-7 * figures 8,9,10 *; | [A]US2011096509 (YOSHIMOCHI KENICHI [JP]) [A] 1,3-7* paragraph [0061]; figures 8,9,10 * | International search | [A]JP2005302951 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2006134990 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS); | [A]WO2009020061 (ROHM CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009295794 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |