EP2932552 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING BATTERY PLATES AND ARRANGING THEM IN WET OR AGM BATTERY CASES FOR CARS OR TRUCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sasit Industrietechnik GmbH Kopernikusstrasse 58 08056 Zwickau / DE | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDENBERGER, Andrè Ernst-Ahnert-Strasse 59 08427 Fraureuth / DE | 02 /
MEIER, Jochen August-Bebel-Strasse 8 08118 Hartenstein / DE | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Auerbach, Bettina Südstrasse 29 08066 Zwickau / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13824292.0 | 05.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013DE00716 | Priority number, date | DE20121024242 | 12.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012024242 | [2015/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014090210 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932552 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
H01M10/0404 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/128 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON BATTERIEPLATTEN UND ANORDNUNG DIESER IN NASS- ODER AGM-BATTERIEKÄSTEN FÜR PERSONEN- ODER LASTKRAFTWAGEN | [2015/43] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING BATTERY PLATES AND ARRANGING THEM IN WET OR AGM BATTERY CASES FOR CARS OR TRUCKS | [2015/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PLAQUES DE BATTERIE, ET DISPOSITION DE CELLES-CI DANS DES BACS DE BATTERIE HUMIDES OU AGM POUR VOITURES DE TOURISME OU CAMIONS | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 29.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2016 | 31.12.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4418464 (DIGIACOMO HECTOR [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 15, line 48 - column 16, line 33 * * abstract * * figures 4,26-28 * [I] 2-8; | [A]US2012240394 (MEIER JOCHEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 0005 - page 2, paragraph 0022 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE102010025885 (MANZ TUEBINGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 0001 - page 5, paragraph 0032 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE102010050743 (LI TEC BATTERY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-4 * * page 6, paragraph 0043 - page 7, paragraph 0048 *; | [A]EP0676258 (KOBOL SA [ES]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 42 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US8001680 (KLEMM THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 40 * | by applicant | DE102012021784 |