EP3154923 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 4-AMINODIPHENYLAMINE PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duslo, A.S. Administrativna budova ev.c. 1236 927 03 Sala / SK | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALKO, Jozef Cintorinska 1938 SK-927 05 Sala / SK | 02 /
VEGH, Zsolt Topolnica 37 SK-925 92 Topolnica / SK | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Bachratá, Magdaléna, et al Krasovského 13 851 01 Bratislava / SK | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 13824684.8 | 16.12.2013 | [2017/16] | WO2013SK50016 | Filing language | SK | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015094128 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3154923 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C9/02, C07C209/36, C07C209/38, C07C211/54 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
C07C209/02 (EP);
C07C209/36 (EP);
C07C209/38 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/02, C07C211/56 (EP);
C07C209/36, C07C211/54 (EP);
C07C209/38, C07C211/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4-AMINODIPHENYLAMIN-VORLÄUFERN | [2017/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 4-AMINODIPHENYLAMINE PRECURSORS | [2017/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE PRÉCURSEURS DE 4-AMINODIPHÉNYLAMINE | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 30.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 18.07.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]CN102060714 ; | [I]WO9959956 (FLEXSYS AMERICA LP [US]) [I] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1591438 (WANG NONGYUE [CN], et al) [A] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]US5117063 (STERN MICHAEL K [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2011-H32484, XP002728746 & CN102060714 A 20110518 (UNIV TIANJIN) [I] 1-8 * abstract * |