EP2880932 - OBTAINING AND USING COMPOSITE MEASUREMENTS FOR POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIOMINA, Iana Mäster Simons Väg 20 D41 S-170 66 Solna / SE | 02 /
ZHANG, Yang Room 602 No. 9 Lane 1662 Zhang Yang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200135 / CN | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13824787.9 | 25.03.2013 | WO2013SE50334 | Priority number, date | US201261678462P | 01.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261678462 P | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014021757 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2880932 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, G01S5/02 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/025 (US);
G01S5/0205 (EP,US);
G01S5/0236 (EP,US);
G01S5/0268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ZUSAMMENGESETZTER MESSUNGEN FÜR POSITIONIERUNGEN | [2015/24] | English: | OBTAINING AND USING COMPOSITE MEASUREMENTS FOR POSITIONING | [2015/24] | French: | OBTENTION ET UTILISATION DE MESURES COMPOSITES POUR POSITIONNEMENT | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.01.2019 | 18.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/06] | 28.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 08.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012182874 (SIOMINA IANA [SE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 3, paragraph 27 - page 11, paragraph 122 * * figures 1-7 * * abstract *; | [A]US2012184290 (KAZMI MUHAMMAD ALI [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 5, paragraph 68 - page 12, paragraph 138 * * figures 1-6 ** abstract * | International search | [A]US2002094824 (KENNEDY JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [A]US2004132466 (KENNEDY JOSEPH P [US]); | [X]US2006009236 (BOSE VANU [US], et al); | [X]US2008026733 (JAATINEN JUSSI [FI]); | [A]WO2010069610 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]WO2011136711 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | by applicant | US2002094824 | US2006009236 | US2008026733 | WO2010069610 | WO2011136711 | US2012182874 |