EP2880442 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astute Medical, Inc. Blg 2 R. 645 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERBERG, Joseph 470 Delage Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
GRAY, Jeff 417 Bay Meadows Way Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 03 /
McPHERSON, Paul 1449 Elva Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Kevin 2409 Newcastle Ave Cardiff By The Sea, CA 92007 / US | 05 /
KAMPF, James, Patrick 5882 Gablewood Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13825415.6 | 02.08.2013 | WO2013US53509 | Priority number, date | US201261679514P | 03.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261679514 P | US201261679545P | 03.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261679545 P | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014022824 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880442 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/573 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (CN);
G01N33/54306 (US);
G01N2333/90287 (EP,US);
G01N2800/347 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND PROGNOSE VON NIERENLÄSION UND NIERENINSUFFIZIENZ | [2015/24] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE | [2015/24] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE PRONOSTIC DE LÉSION RÉNALE ET D'INSUFFISANCE RÉNALE | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 07.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007154897 (YEN CHUNG-YANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,2,17,24,25,26 *; | [A] - Chao-Wen Cheng ET AL, "Calcium-binding proteins annexin A2 and S100A6 are sensors of tubular injury and recovery in acute renal failure", Kidney international, (2005), pages 2694 - 2703, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/16316344, XP055110112 [A] 1-15 * page 2699, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1523-1755.2005.00740.x | [A] - YUEN PETER S T ET AL, "Ischemic and nephrotoxic acute renal failure are distinguished by their broad transcriptomic responses", PHYSIOLOGICAL GENOMICS, (2006), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 375 - 386, XP002524906 [A] 1-15 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physiolgenomics.00223.2005 | [A] - LENA DAS ET AL, "Biomarkers for renal disease in childhood", CURRENT RHEUMATOLOGY REPORTS, (2009), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 218 - 225, XP055246296 [A] 1-15 * page 222, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11926-009-0030-4 | International search | [X]WO2011075744 (ASTUTE MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2012102963 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US], et al); | [A] - DE GEUS ET AL., "' Biomarkers for the prediction of acute kidney injury: a narrative review on current status and future challenges", CLINICAL KIDNEY JOURNAL., (201204), vol. 5, no. ISSUE, pages 102 - 108, XP055098102 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ckj/sfs008 |