EP2882245 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Miho c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
UGA, Shinsuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | 01 /
MOCHIZUKI Mitsuru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
MAEDA Miho c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
UGA Shinsuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13825742.3 | 02.08.2013 | WO2013JP70983 | Priority number, date | JP20120171871 | 02.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012171871 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021447 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882245 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, // H04W88/08 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/00 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04W36/0085 (EP);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/54 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP);
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W36/06 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/11] | H04W72/04, // H04W88/08 | ||
Former IPC [2015/24] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/24] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2015/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2015 | Translation filed | 30.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 06.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/29] | Divisional application(s) | EP21177975.6 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010150462 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2011134337 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2012008739 (PANTECH CO LTD [KR], et al); | [Y]JP2012070134 (SHARP KK); |