EP2882124 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, AND HARQ RESPONSE TRANSMITTING METHOD AND RECEIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKETANI, Kengo c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13826115.1 | 09.04.2013 | WO2013JP02414 | Priority number, date | JP20120169094 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012169094 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014020798 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882124 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04J99/00, H04B7/04, H04W16/28, H04W28/04, H04L5/00 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
H04L1/1861 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1893 (US);
H04B7/04 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (US);
H04L1/0009 (US);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | H04J99/00, H04B7/04, H04W16/28, H04W28/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE SENDEVERFAHREN UND EMPFANGSVERFAHREN FÜR HARQ-ANTWORT | [2015/24] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, AND HARQ RESPONSE TRANSMITTING METHOD AND RECEIVING METHOD | [2015/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE RÉPONSE À UNE REQUÊTE HARQ | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2015 | Translation filed | 27.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 22.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010087641 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * page 29, line 10 - page 31, line 8 * [I] 2-7; | [XI]US2010239040 (BELURI MIHAELA C [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0043] - [0047] - [0050] - [0062] - [0086] - [0092] - [0097] , [0099] , [0102] , [0105] - [0118] * [I] 2-7; | [XI]EP2378691 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0092] * [I] 2-7; | [XI]WO2011145832 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * abstract * [I] 2-7; | [P]US2013064228 (JANG JIWOONG [KR], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0081] , [0 82] , [0 84] , [0 89] * | International search | [Y]WO2006059678 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]US2007162827 (WALTON JAY R [US], et al); | [X]WO2010107779 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al); | [X]WO2011099282 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y] - CATT ET AL., "To reuse the TBS tables for punctured PRB", 3GPP TSG-RAN WGL#54B RL-083947, (200809), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg-ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_54b/Docs/R1-083947.zip, XP050317255 | by applicant | JP2009522870 | JP2010193485 |