EP2863387 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AUDIO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Discovery Co., Ltd. Golden Tower 10th Floor 511, Samseong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-745 / KR | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Hyunoh 110-1203, Prugio-Grandbleu Apt 123 Dongpangyo-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-881 / KR | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2015/17] | Application number, filing date | 13826484.1 | 26.07.2013 | WO2013KR06730 | Priority number, date | KR20120084207 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120084207 | [2015/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021587 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863387 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G10K11/1752 (EP,US);
H04N21/439 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/00 (KR);
G10L19/008 (EP,US);
G10L21/0264 (US);
H04S3/008 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | G10L19/00, H04N21/439 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN VON TONSIGNALEN | [2015/17] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AUDIO SIGNAL | [2015/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL AUDIO | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | Translation filed | 14.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 27.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1735778 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1,2,4,6 * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 9 * * page 14, line 14 - line 22 * * page 15, line 15 - page 17, line 28 * [A] 3,5 | International search | [A]US6499010 (FALLER CHRISTOF [CZ]); | [A]US2005234716 (VERNON STEPHEN D [US], et al); | [A]US2007208557 (LI JIN [US], et al); | [A]US2008004873 (LIU CHI-MIN [TW], et al); | [A]US2008091415 (SCHAFER RONALD W [US]) |