EP3025522 - TRAFFIC COORDINATION FOR COMMUNICATION SESSIONS INVOLVING WIRELESS TERMINALS AND SERVER DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORLIN, Cristian Tegelviksgatan 33, 3tr S-116 41 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
FORMO, Joakim Knipvägen 157 S-184 62 Åkersberga / SE | 03 /
GÅRDMAN, Marcus Lilla Sällskapets väg 121 S-127 61 Skärholmen / SE | [2019/43] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
NORLIN, Cristian Tengdahlsgatan 21 4tr. S-116 48 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
FORMO, Joakim Knipvägen 157 S-184 62 Åkersberga / SE | |||
03 /
GÅRDMAN, Marcus Lilla Sällskapets väg 121 S-127 61 Skärholmen / SE | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 13826651.5 | 13.12.2013 | [2016/22] | WO2013SE51509 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015088412 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025522 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3025522 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/38, H04W4/18, H04W56/00, H04L29/08 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04L67/566 (EP,RU,US);
H04L67/1095 (US);
H04W4/38 (EP,US);
H04W56/001 (EP,US);
H04W76/00 (US);
H04W56/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | H04W4/00, H04W72/12, H04L29/08, H04W4/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKEHRSKOORDINATION FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSSITZUNGEN MIT DRAHTLOSEN ENDGERÄTEN UND SERVERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/22] | English: | TRAFFIC COORDINATION FOR COMMUNICATION SESSIONS INVOLVING WIRELESS TERMINALS AND SERVER DEVICES | [2016/22] | French: | COORDINATION DE TRAFIC POUR SESSIONS DE COMMUNICATION IMPLIQUANT DES TERMINAUX SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIFS SERVEURS | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2013 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | IE | 13.12.2019 | LU | 13.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 13.12.2013 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.12.2013 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 13.12.2013 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2403276 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]); | [X]US2012044887 (ZDARSKY FRANK [DE], et al); | [X]US2013010693 (LUNA MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2013151469 (BAKER PAUL [GB], et al) |