Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.03.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.09.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.07.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
06.04.2016 | Change - representative | |
18.12.2015 | Change - classification | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
18.12.2015 | Change - classification | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
18.12.2015 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
16.10.2015 | Change - extension states | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
27.07.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.05.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
15.05.2015 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
05.03.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.02.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.02.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.02.2015 | Change - representative | |
07.02.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.02.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.02.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |