EP2996167 - FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SAME, AND OLED DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hefei BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 2177, Tonglingbei Rd. Hefei New Railway Station District Hefei, Anhui 230012 / CN | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2023/16] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states Hefei BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 2177, Tonglingbei Rd. Hefei New Railway Station District Hefei, Anhui 230012 / CN | ||
For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Yuanhui No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Hui No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Chun No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yisan No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2023/16] |
Former [2016/11] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13828968.1 | 26.08.2013 | [2016/11] | WO2013CN82311 | Priority number, date | CN201310172698 | 10.05.2013 Original published format: CN201310172698 | [2016/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014180077 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996167 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2996167 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, H01L51/00 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H10K77/111 (EP,US);
H10K50/814 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/81 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K2102/311 (US);
H10K71/60 (EP,KR);
H10K85/113 (US);
H10K85/1135 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/11] | H01L51/52, H01L51/56, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLES ARRAYSUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE OLED-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2016/11] | English: | FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SAME, AND OLED DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2016/11] | French: | SUBSTRAT FLEXIBLE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE A DELO | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2014 | Translation filed | 18.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2014 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | GB | 26.08.2023 | IE | 26.08.2023 | LU | 26.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
GB | 26.08.2023 | ||
IE | 26.08.2023 | ||
LU | 26.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
GB | 26.08.2023 | ||
IE | 26.08.2023 | ||
LU | 26.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 26.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 26.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 26.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008047355 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [X]JP2009146640 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [XY]WO2012032446 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | International search | [Y]CN1790770 (SAMSUNG SDI GERMANY GMBH [KR]); | [A]WO2007145390 (KIM DOO-ILL [KR]); | [X]US2008314626 (MOORE CHAD B [US]); | [X]CN101427377 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [X]CN102063951 (SVG OPTRONICS CO LTD, et al); | [Y]US2012211739 (KOYAMA HIROKAZU [JP], et al); | [X]CN103098255 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV, et al); | [XP]CN103236504 (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al); | [E]CN203218338U (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al) |