|
23.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Amendments not yet acceptable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
129 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
130 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
116 |