Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9417251 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2016 | B2 | US2014051657 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313964684 | 12.08.2013 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3594686 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2020 | A3 | EP3594686 | 15.01.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP13829280 | 12.08.2013 | WO2013US54527 | 12.08.2013 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019216633 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US54527 | 12.08.2013 | AU2019216633 | 14.08.2019 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | AU2013302871 | 12.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013302871B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2019 | B2 | AU2013302871 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US54527 | 12.08.2013 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2885642 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2019 | B1 | EP2885642 | 13.07.2016 | A4 | EP2885642 | 24.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US54527 | 12.08.2013 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2881785 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US54527 | 12.08.2013 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2885642T | 29.07.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US54527 | 12.08.2013 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2737025T | 09.01.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US54527 | 12.08.2013 | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014028382 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261683144 | 14.08.2012 | Type | Divisional application | EP3594686 |