EP2885642 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SCREENING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING NON-ANTICOAGULANT SULFATED POLYSACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Zaehlerweg 4 6300 Zug / CH | For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark, Opfikon / CH | ||
For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | |||
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Baxter International Inc One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | ||
For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOCKAL, Michael Mariahilferstrasse 173-175/2/54 A-1150 Vienna / AT | 02 /
SCHEIFLINGER, Friedrich Michelbeuerngasse 4/17 A-1090 Vienna / AT | 03 /
ZHANG, Zhenqing Gaohe Road 58 87 -701 Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu Province 215021 / CN | 04 /
TILL, Susanne Schrotzbergstrasse 2/23 A-1020 Vienna / AT | 05 /
KNAPPE, Sabine Magdalenenstrasse 6/8 A-1060 Vienna / AT | 06 /
SZABO, Christina 37121 N. Twin Oaks Drive Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2019/20] |
Former [2015/26] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13829280.0 | 12.08.2013 | [2019/20] | WO2013US54527 | Priority number, date | US201261683144P | 14.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261683144 P | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014028382 | Date: | 20.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2885642 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2885642 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/86, G01N33/50, G01N33/48 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM SCREENING VON ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NICHT GERINNENDEN SULFATIERTEN POLYSACCHARIDEN | [2015/26] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SCREENING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING NON-ANTICOAGULANT SULFATED POLYSACCHARIDES | [2015/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE CRIBLAGE DE COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES POLYSACCHARIDES SULFATÉS NON COAGULANTS | [2015/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 03.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2018 | 16.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19174514.0 / EP3594686 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2013 | AL | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | LU | 12.08.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.08.2013 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.08.2013 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.08.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 15.05.2019 | |
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 15.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005117912 (AVIGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims, example 3; par.158, 161 *; | [X]WO2008103234 (AVIGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * p.10 par.2, example 3 p.22, example 4 p.31, conclusion p.33; claims *; | [X]WO2011088267 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * examples 4-7; claims; p.1 l.28 - p.3 l.29 * | [T] - ZHANG ZHENQING ET AL, "Screening of complex fucoidans from four brown algae species as procoagulant agents", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (20140907), vol. 115, doi:10.1016/J.CARBPOL.2014.09.001, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 677 - 685, XP029019640 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2014.09.001 | [X] - ZHANG ZHENQING ET AL, "Screening of Complex-Fucoidans from Different Species of Brown Algae as Procoagulant Drug Candidates Based on Their Activity, Structural Properties, Impurities", GLYCOBIOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (20111101), vol. 21, no. 11, ISSN 0959-6658, page 1508, XP009188156 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - DOCKAL MICHAEL ET AL, "Structural and Functional Characterization of Fucoidan and Its Procoagulant Effect in An Ex Vivo Model of Factor VIII-Inhibited Guinea Pigs", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (201111), Database accession no. PREV201200219543, XP009188172 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - DOCKAL MICHAEL ET AL, "Anticoagulant Activity and Mechanism of Non-Anticoagulant Sulfated Polysaccharides", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (201111), Database accession no. PREV201200218491, XP009188173 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2009269325 (JOHNSON KIRK W [US]); | [X] - LIU, TONGYAO ET AL., "Improved coagulation in bleeding disorders by non-anticoagulant sulfated polysaccharides (NASP)", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (2006), vol. 95, no. 1, pages 68 - 76, XP009128550 | [A] - SCHAUB, ROBERT G., "Recent advances in the development of coagulation factors and procoagulants for the treatment of hemophilia", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2011), vol. 82, no. 2, pages 91 - 98, XP055186706 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2011.03.015 | [A] - PIPE, STEVEN W., "Hemophilia: new protein therapeutics", HEMATOLOGY, (2010), vol. 2010, no. 1, pages 203 - 209, XP055186707 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/asheducation-2010.1.203 | [A] - FOGARTY, PATRICK F., "Biological rationale for new drugs in the bleeding disorders pipeline", HEMATOLOGY, (2011), vol. 2011, no. 1, pages 397 - 404, XP055186710 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/asheducation-2011.1.397 | by applicant | WO2005117912 | WO2008103234 | WO2011088267 | - ZHANG et al., Glycobiology, (20110000), vol. 21, no. 11, page 1508 | - Biosis, Database accession no. PREV201200219543, XP009188172 | - Dockal Michael; et al.,, "Structural and Functional Characterization of Fucoidan and Its Procoagulant Effect in An Ex Vivo Model of Factor VIII-Inhibited Guinea Pigs", BLOOD,, vol. 118, no. 21, (20111101), page 983, XP009188172 | - Biosis, Database accession no. PREV201200218491, XP009188173 | - Dockal Michael; Till Susanne; Knappe Sabine; Ehrlich Hartmut J; Scheiflinger Friedrich, "Anticoagulant Activity and Mechanism of Non-Anticoagulant Sulfated Polysaccharides", BLOOD,, vol. 118, no. 21, (20111101), page 543, XP009188173 | - CALVO-ASIN, J.A. et al., J. Chem. Soc, Perkin Trans, (19970000), vol. 1, page 1079 | - HEMKER et al., Pathophysiol. Haemost. Thromb., vol. 33, pages 4 - 15 | - LIU et al., Thromb. Haemost., vol. 95, pages 68 - 76 | - NORDFANG et al., Thromb Haemost, (19910000), vol. 66, pages 464 - 467 | - WELSCH et al., Thrombosis Research, (19910000), vol. 64, pages 213 - 222 | US20100449712 |