EP2885597 - HOLSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vista Outdoor Operations LLC 938 University Park Boulevard, Suite 200 Clearfield, UT 84015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Vista Outdoor Operations LLC 938 University Park Boulevard, Suite 200 Clearfield UT 84015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEATES, Eric M. 500-58th Street Virginia Beach, VA 23451 / US | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | adares Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Reininger & Partner GmbB Tauentzienstraße 7 b/c 10789 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | adares Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Reininger & Partner Schumannstraße 2 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13829491.3 | 16.08.2013 | WO2013US55418 | Priority number, date | US201261684615P | 17.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261684615 P | US201313911710 | 06.06.2013 Original published format: US201313911710 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014028876 | Date: | 20.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2885597 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F41C33/02 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
F41C33/0227 (EP,US);
F41C33/0263 (EP,US);
F41C33/0272 (EP,US);
Y10S224/912 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49863 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/26] | F41C33/02, A45F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | HALFTER | [2015/26] | English: | HOLSTER | [2015/26] | French: | ÉTUI | [2015/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 07.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007181619 (SEYFERT TODD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0036] - [0 45] - [0053]; figures 1-16 * [I] 3-7,9-14; | [XI]WO2010064268 (RADAR LEATHER DIVISION S R L [IT], et al) [X] 4,5,9 * pages 2-5; figures 1-8 * [I] 6-8,10-13 | International search | [A]US2005205621 (SHULTS BRIAN J [US]); | [X]US2007181619 (SEYFERT TODD [US], et al); | [A]US2011101063 (ZUSMAN NISIM [IL]); | [A]US2011163138 (TYYBAKINOJA JARNO [FI]); | [A]US8235263 (YEATES ERIC M [US], et al) |