EP2888571 - METHODS AND KITS FOR RAPID AND REVERSIBLE BIOMOLECULAR LABELING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/27] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR RAPID AND REVERSIBLE BIOMOLECULAR LABELING | ||
[2022/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stemcell Technologies Inc. 570 West Seventh Avenue Suite 400 Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 1B3 / CA | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Samuel Jon 3208-128 Cordova Street West Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 0E6 / CA | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2015/27] | Kelly, Donal Morgan FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13830310.2 | 22.08.2013 | [2022/51] | WO2013CA00733 | Priority number, date | US201261692422P | 23.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261692422 P | US201361781651P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361781651 P | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014029012 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888571 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2888571 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/26, G01N33/58 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
B01D15/265 (EP,US);
G01N33/533 (US);
G01N33/54306 (US);
G01N33/56966 (US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/7155 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | G01N1/34, B01D15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS FÜR SCHNELLE UND UMKEHRBARE BIOMOLEKULARE MARKIERUNG | [2022/03] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR RAPID AND REVERSIBLE BIOMOLECULAR LABELING | [2022/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET KITS DE MARQUAGE BIOMOLÉCULAIRE RAPIDE ET RÉVERSIBLE | [2022/03] |
Former [2015/27] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR SCHNELLE UND UMKEHRBARE BIOMOLEKULARE MARKIERUNG | ||
Former [2015/27] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR RAPID AND REVERSIBLE BIOMOLECULAR LABELING | ||
Former [2015/27] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE MARQUAGE BIOMOLÉCULAIRE RAPIDE ET RÉVERSIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 03.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | IT | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | NL | 21.12.2022 | PL | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SE | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | IE | 22.08.2023 | LU | 22.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
IT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
IE | 22.08.2023 | ||
LU | 22.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
IT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 22.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 22.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0195942 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2004091494 (PR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [XA] - ANASTASE S ET AL, "Affinity chromatography of human anti-dextran antibodies Isolation of two distinct populations", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES AND APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19961115), vol. 686, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(96)00199-5, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 141 - 150, XP004071231 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [2.3.2] - paragraph [2.4.2] * [A] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(96)00199-5 | International search | [A]US5429927 (AFSETH JOHN [NO], et al); | [A]US5985658 (COLINAS ROBERT JAMES [US], et al) | by applicant | US4411993 | US4543439 | USRE32011E | US4868109 | US4902614 | - WILLIAM D. HUSE ET AL., "Generation of a Large Combinational Library of the Immunoglobulin Repertoire in Phage Lambda", SCIENCE, (198912), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - L. SASTRY ET AL., "Cloning of the Immunological Repertoire in Escherichia coli for Generation of Monoclonal Catalytic Antibodies: Construction of a Heavy Chain Variable Region-Specific cDNA Library", PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (198908), vol. 86, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.86.15.5728, pages 5728 - 5732, XP008026026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.15.5728 | - MICHELLE ALTING-MEES ET AL., MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY EXPRESSION LIBRARIES: A EXPENSIVE AND LABORIOUS RECOMBINANT PROTEIN OR ANTIBODY METHODS TO GENERATE THE REQUIRED BINDING PARTNERS |