EP2889315 - CURABLE FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER CURED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIYAMA, Norihide c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiromasa c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
KUNIMOTO, Akinobu c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 04 /
OHKURA, Masahiro c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 13831227.7 | 14.08.2013 | WO2013JP71921 | Priority number, date | JP20120182281 | 21.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012182281 | [2015/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014030586 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889315 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/24, C08K5/14, C08F214/26, C08F214/18, C08F8/26, // C08L27/18, C08F236/20 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
C08J3/24 (EP,US);
C08F216/1408 (US);
C08F214/262 (EP,US);
C08F299/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08J2327/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F214/262, C08F236/20 (US,EP);
C08F8/26, C08F214/262 (US,EP);
C08K5/14, C08L27/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | C08F214/18, C08F293/00, C08J3/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARES FLUORHALTIGE POLYMER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND FLUORHALTIGES GEHÄRTETES POLYMERPRODUKT | [2015/27] | English: | CURABLE FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND FLUORINE-CONTAINING POLYMER CURED PRODUCT | [2015/27] | French: | POLYMÈRE CONTENANT DU FLUOR DURCISSABLE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET PRODUIT DURCI DE POLYMÈRE CONTENANT DU FLUOR | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2015 | Translation filed | 05.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 05.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005350490 (YUNIMATEKKU KK) [A] 1-11,15-17 * Reference Examples 1 and 2 ** claim 1 *; | [X]EP2214241 (NOK CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,15-17 * claims 1-3 * * example 1 * * tables 1, 2 *; | [A]EP2383302 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11,15-17 * claims 1-11 * * example 1 *; | [X]WO2012073977 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,15-17 * claims 1-9 * * Fluoropolymer P1 * | International search | [X]WO2011096370 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2012073977 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3580889 | US4035565 | US4243770 | US4394489 | US4525539 | WO9014367 | WO2009096342 |