EP2888882 - LOSSLESS COMPRESSION OF FRAGMENTED IMAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMC Corporation 176 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARIKAR, Moses 44 Scott Lane Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
RAMAKRISHNA, Deepa 176 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2015/36] |
Former [2015/27] | 01 /
CHARIKAR, Moses 176 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | ||
02 /
RAMAKRISHNA, Deepa 176 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13831514.8 | 30.06.2013 | WO2013US48840 | Priority number, date | US201261691735P | 21.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261691735 P | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014031240 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2888882 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/13, H04N19/88 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (US);
G06T9/005 (US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (US);
H04N19/88 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | H04N19/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | VERLUSTLOSE KOMPRIMIERUNG FRAGMENTIERTER BILDDATEN | [2015/27] | English: | LOSSLESS COMPRESSION OF FRAGMENTED IMAGE DATA | [2015/27] | French: | COMPRESSION SANS PERTE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES FRAGMENTÉES | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 13.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2023 | 26.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/08] | 14.10.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004202374 (VENKATARAMAN KARTIK [US]) [I] 9-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0033]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054]; figure 11 *; | [IY]US2006235679 (SPERSCHNEIDER RALPH [DE], et al) [I] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3; | [I]US2007211950 (SHIMA MASATO [JP]) [I] 9-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 3-4 ** paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figure 5 *; | [IY]US2009024643 (MITTAL MILLIND [US]) [I] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0085] * [Y] 3; | [XYI]US2009254521 (RAMAN VIJAYSHANKAR [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0025]; figure 2, * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048] * [Y] 3 [I] 2; | [IY]US2012117064 (DRAESE OLIVER [DE], et al) [I] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0013]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063] * [Y] 3 | International search | [Y]WO0110038 (V E GROUP LLC [US]); | [Y]US6320986 (STROHACKER OSCAR CONRAD [US]); | [Y]US2002176632 (CHRYSAFIS CHRISTOS [US], et al); | [X]US2004217956 (BESL PAUL [US], et al); | [Y]US2006235683 (SPERSCHNEIDER RALPH [DE], et al); | [Y]US2008317368 (TU CHENGJIE [US], et al); | [Y]US2011035226 (MEHROTRA SANJEEV [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012078280 (SONOCINE INC [US], et al) |