EP2892283 - RADIO BASE STATION APPARATUS, RADIO BASE STATION CONTROL APPARATUS AND TRANSITION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKIGUCHI, Takahiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
KIYOSHIMA, Kohei c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
MASUDA, Masafumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
KAWABE, Yasuhiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
HARANO, Seigo c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2015/28] | Application number, filing date | 13832191.4 | 08.07.2013 | WO2013JP68671 | Priority number, date | JP20120191201 | 31.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012191201 | [2015/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014034281 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2892283 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
H04W36/0005 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W52/0225 (EP,US);
H04W52/0254 (EP,US);
H04W52/0258 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Title | German: | FUNKBASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FUNKBASISSTATION UND ÜBERGANGSSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2015/28] | English: | RADIO BASE STATION APPARATUS, RADIO BASE STATION CONTROL APPARATUS AND TRANSITION CONTROL METHOD | [2015/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE RADIO, APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE STATION DE BASE RADIO ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE TRANSITION | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2014 | Translation filed | 21.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 25.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007300510 (NTT DOCOMO INC) |