EP2890787 - CROWDING AGENT-INDUCED NUCLEIC ACID TRANSFER INTO A RECIPIENT HOST CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthetic Genomics, Inc. 11149 N. Torrey Pines Rd, Suite 100 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARAS, Bogumil, J. 4605 Olney Street, Apt. 11 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
HUTCHISON, Clyde, A. 5528 Linda Rosa Avenue La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Hamilton, O. 5345 Toscana Way Apt 5410 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
SUZUKI, Yo 8799 Gilman Drive, Unit C La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/18] |
Former [2015/28] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13833688.8 | 30.08.2013 | [2019/18] | WO2013US57533 | Priority number, date | US201261695864P | 31.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261695864 P | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014036404 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2890787 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2890787 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/87, C12N15/81 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
C12N15/81 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | C12N15/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CROWDING-AGENT-INDUZIERTER NUKLEINSÄURETRANSFER IN EINE EMPFÄNGERWIRTSZELLE | [2015/28] | English: | CROWDING AGENT-INDUCED NUCLEIC ACID TRANSFER INTO A RECIPIENT HOST CELL | [2015/28] | French: | TRANSFERT D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE INDUIT PAR UN AGENT DE RASSEMBLEMENT DANS UNE CELLULE HÔTE RECEVEUSE | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 08.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2013 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | IT | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IE | 30.08.2019 | LU | 30.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.08.2013 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.08.2013 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IE | 30.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
LU | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP3932307B (GUNMA PREFECTURE) [X] 1,3,5,8,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0020] *; | [I]WO2008144192 (SYNTHETIC GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4,7,11,14,15 * paragraph [0067]; table S4 *; | [X]WO2009048885 (SYNTHETIC GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [X] 14 * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0105]; figure 7; examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO2011109031 (SYNTHETIC GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [X] 14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0290] , [0294] , [0388]; figure 8; example 3A; claim - *; | [I] - A. SVOBODA, "Fusion of Yeast Protoplasts Induced by Polyethylene Glycol", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (19781101), vol. 109, no. 1, doi:10.1099/00221287-109-1-169, ISSN 0022-1287, pages 169 - 175, XP055271758 [I] 1,5,8,10-12,14,15 * page 172, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/00221287-109-1-169 | [X] - VAN SOLINGEN P ET AL, "Fusion of yeast spheroplasts.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY MAY 1977, (197705), vol. 130, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 946 - 947, XP002757585 [X] 14 * page 946, column 2, line 8 - line 13 * | [XP] - BOGUMIL J KARAS ET AL, "Direct transfer of whole genomes from bacteria to yeast", NATURE METHODS, (20130331), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nmeth.2433, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 410 - 412, XP055089021 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.2433 | [T] - KARAS BOGUMIL J ET AL, "Transferring whole genomes from bacteria to yeast spheroplasts using entire bacterial cells to reduce DNA shearing.", NATURE PROTOCOLS APR 2014, (201404), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1750-2799, pages 743 - 750, XP002757586 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2014.045 | International search | [Y]WO9831837 (MAXYGEN INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2004046330 (MORPHOTEK INC [US], et al); | [Y] - GURI, A., "Somatic Hybridization Between Selected Lycopersicon And Solanum Species.", PLANT CELL REPORTS., (199106), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 76 - 80, XP055260417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00236461 | [Y] - DOGANLAR, S ET AL., "A Comparative Genetic Linkage Map Of Eggplant (Solanum melangena) And Its Implications For Genome Evolution In The Solanaceae.", GENETICS., (200208), vol. 161, pages 1697 - 1711, XP055214124 | [Y] - KAHN, K. ET AL., "GENE TRANSFER TECHNOLOGIES AND THEIR APPLICATIONS: ROLES IN HUMAN DISEASES.", ASIAN JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES., (2010), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 208 - 218, XP055260423 | [Y] - BENDERS, G., "Cloning Whole Bacterial Genomes In Yeast.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20100307), vol. 38, pages 2558 - 2569, XP002584298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKQ119 | [Y] - LARTIGUE, C., "Creating Bacterial Strains From Genomes That Have Been Cloned And Engineered In Yeast.", SCIENCE, (20090925), vol. 325, no. 5948, pages 1693 - 1696, XP002584297 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1173759 | by applicant | WO02057437 | US6670154 | US2005003511 | US2005019924 | US7083971 | WO2008144192 | WO2011109031 | - ITAYA et al., Nat Methods, (20080000), vol. 5, page 41 | - YOON; KOOB, Nucleic Acids Res, (20030000), vol. 31, page 1407 | - WHEELER et al., Gene, (19970000), vol. 198, page 203 | - GUPTA; HOO, Plant Mol Biol., (19910000), vol. 17, page 361 | - SMAILUS et al., Syst Synth Biol., (20070000), vol. 1, page 139 | - ITAYA et al., PNAS USA, (20050000), vol. 102, page 15971 | - GIBSON et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 319, page 1215 | - GIBSON et al., PNAS USA, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 51, pages 20404 - 9 | - BRADSHAW et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19950000), vol. 23, pages 4850 - 56 | - GIBSON et al., Science, (20100000), vol. 329, no. 5987, pages 52 - 6 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. L43967 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. U00089.2 | - AZEVEDO et al., PNAS USA, (19930000), vol. 90, page 6047 | - HEUER et al., Electrophoresis, (19980000), vol. 19, page 486 | - KUSPA et al., PNAS USA, (19890000), vol. 86, page 8917 | - KOZAK, Gene, (19990000), vol. 234, page 187 | - KORNBERG, Trends Cell Biol., (19990000), vol. 9, page M46 | - BELFORT; ROBERTS, Nucleic Acids Res, (19970000), vol. 25, page 3379 | - STINCHCOMB et al., PNAS USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4559 | - D. G. GIBSON et al., PNAS USA, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 20404 - 9 | - ARAKI, K. et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (19970000), vol. 25, pages 868 - 872 | - NOSKOV, V.N. et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20100000), vol. 38, pages 2570 - 76 | - LARTIGUE, C. et al., Science, (20090000), vol. 325, pages 1693 - 96 |