17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
21.10.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
14.10.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.10.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.10.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.06.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
23.10.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
23.10.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
28.08.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
28.07.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
08.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.03.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
27.03.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
11.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
20.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|