Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2864431 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2016 | B1 | EP2864431 | 25.11.2015 | A4 | EP2864431 | 29.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213530211 | 22.06.2012 | WO2013US46320 | 18.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014042733 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213530211 | 22.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8809445 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2014 | B2 | US2013345356 | 26.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213530211 | 22.06.2012 |