EP2897123 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2018 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Takehisa c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
SHIMOSHIKIRYOH, Fumikazu c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13836571.3 | 05.09.2013 | WO2013JP73970 | Priority number, date | JP20120201917 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012201917 | [2015/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014042073 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2897123 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G02F1/133, G09G3/20 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
G09G3/3607 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3614 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3659 (KR,US);
G09G2300/0447 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0452 (KR,US);
G09G2300/0478 (KR,US);
G09G2300/0809 (KR,US);
G09G2310/027 (KR,US);
G09G2320/028 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2015/30] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2015/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2015 | Translation filed | 26.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 05.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/46] | 26.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP2378509 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0224] - paragraph [0240] * * paragraph [0281] - paragraph [0284]; figures 47-49 * [A] 3-5,8 [Y] 11,12 [I] 7; | [Y] - Toshio Kamiya ET AL, "Present status of amorphous In-Ga-Zn-O thin-film transistors", Science and Technology of Advanced Materials, doi:10.1088/1468-6996/11/4/044305, (20100910), pages 044305 - 23, URL: http://iopscience.iop.org/1468-6996/11/4/044305, (20150702), XP055199892 [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1468-6996/11/4/044305 | International search | [A]JP2004062146 (SHARP KK); | [A]WO2007034876 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2005316211 (FUJITSU DISPLAY TECH, et al); | [A]JP2007226196 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2003255908 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO2006098247 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2004062146 | US6958791 | WO2007034876 | US8159432 | JP2012134475 |