EP2895799 - CLIMATE SMART FAN VENTILATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tempo Mechanical Services Inc 2611 East Pioneer Dr. Irving, TX 75061 / US | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUNDERS, John, S. P.O. Box 155049 Irving, TX 75015 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2015/30] | Application number, filing date | 13837106.7 | 10.09.2013 | WO2013US58978 | Priority number, date | US201261699696P | 11.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261699696 P | US201261718178P | 24.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261718178 P | US201361791051P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361791051 P | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014043099 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2895799 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/02, F24F7/08, F04D25/08, F24F11/00, F24F7/06 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F7/065 (US);
F24F11/47 (EP,US);
F24F11/62 (EP,US);
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
F24F2110/00 (EP,US);
F24F2110/12 (EP,US);
F24F2110/22 (EP,US);
F24F2120/20 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | F24F11/02, F24F7/08, F04D25/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | BELÜFTUNG MIT EINEM KLIMABEWUSSTEN LÜFTER | [2015/30] | English: | CLIMATE SMART FAN VENTILATION | [2015/30] | French: | AÉRATION PAR VENTILATEUR AVEC INTELLIGENCE CLIMATIQUE | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2249291 (BURDINAT PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 21; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102010055065 (SEIFARTH RENATE [DE]) [X] 1-15* paragraphs [0006] , [0034] - [0036] - [0044] - [0047]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US5031515 (NIEMELAE MERTSI [FI], et al); | [X]US5881951 (CARPENTER PETER W [US]); | [Y]JP2005299969 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]KR20100086781 (MORGAN FNC INC [KR]); | [X]WO2011119091 (BERGSTEN RIKARD [SE]) |