EP2897196 - SEPARATOR FOR ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY OF SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Routejade Inc. (Gayagok-myeon) 24-8, Gayagongdan-gil Nonsan-si Chungcheongnam-do 320-844 / KR | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Young Ho 101-1002 Urim Rumi Art Apt. Geumam-dong Gyeryong-si Chungcheongnam-do 321-763 / KR | 02 /
KIM, In Joong 102-701, Jugong 1 daji Apt., 59-5 Jungang-ro 260beon-gil Nonsan-si Chungcheongnam-do 320-755 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kyung Joon 102-801 Gyeyang Imkwang Geudaega Apt. 203 Seoun-dong Gyeyang-gu Incheon 407-070 / KR | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13837719.7 | 10.09.2013 | WO2013KR08162 | Priority number, date | KR20120100331 | 11.09.2012 Original published format: KR 20120100331 | [2015/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014042399 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2897196 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02, H01M2/16, H01M2/18 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H01M50/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M50/103 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/107 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/466 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H01M50/548 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/564 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | H01M2/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | SEPARATOR FÜR EINE ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2015/30] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY OF SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING SAME | [2015/30] | French: | SÉPARATEUR POUR UN ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE D'UNE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ET BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE COMPRENANT CE DERNIER | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2015 | Translation filed | 09.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 12.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002119367 (WATANABE HIDETO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12 * figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109] * [A] 8; | [XAI]JP2012048989 (HITACHI MAXELL ENERGY LTD) [X] 1,2,5-12 * figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * [A] 4[I] 3 | International search | [A]KR20010104150 (KOREA POWERCELL INC [KR]); | [X]JP2002252023 (NEC TOKIN TOCHIGI LTD, et al); | [A]KR20070096280 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20110046077 (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) |