EP2895527 - LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT BRANCHED POLYAMINES FOR DELIVERY OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology And Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis North Singapore 138632 / SG | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Wei Institute of Bioengineering and Technology 31 BiopolisWay The Nanos 04-01 Singapore 138669 / SG | 02 /
COADY, Daniel, J. IBM Almaden Research Center 650 Harry Road San Jose, CA 95120-6099 / US | 03 /
ENGLER, Amanda, C. IBM Almaden Research Center 650 Harry Road San Jose, CA 95120-6099 / US | 04 /
HEDRICK, James, L. IBM Almaden Research Center 650 Harry Road San Jose, CA 95120-6099 / US | 05 /
TEO, Pei, Yun Institute of Bioengineering and Nanotechnology 31 Biopolis Way The Nanos 04-01 Singapore 138669 / SG | 06 /
YANG, Chuan Institute of Bioengineering and Nanotechnology 31 Biopolis Way The Nanos 04-01 Singapore 138669 / SG | 07 /
YANG, Yi, Yan Institute of Bioengineering and Nanotechnology 31 Biopolis Way The Nanos 04-01 Singapore 138669 / SG | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Wilson, Gary HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 13837806.2 | 04.09.2013 | WO2013US57978 | Priority number, date | US201213613353 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: US201213613353 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014042922 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2895527 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/02, A61K47/48, C08L79/02 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
C08G73/0206 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | VERZWEIGTE POLYAMINE MIT GERINGEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT ZUR FREISETZUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN WIRKSTOFFEN | [2015/30] | English: | LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT BRANCHED POLYAMINES FOR DELIVERY OF BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE MATERIALS | [2015/30] | French: | POLYAMINES RAMIFIÉES À FAIBLE POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE MATIÈRES BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVES | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 03.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008112916 (WAGNER ERNST [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011078805 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010305281 (FUJIWARA MASAKI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2009233359 (KWON YOUNG JIK [US]); | [A]EP1320386 (EGEN INC [US]); | [A]US2007231392 (WAGNER ERNST [DE], et al); | [A]US2005059068 (HUANG HAOQIANG [US], et al); | [A]EP2172508 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) |