EP2896208 - COMBINING VIDEO AND AUDIO STREAMS UTILIZING PIXEL REPETITION BANDWIDTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Image, Inc. 1140 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMANN, William Conrad 1140 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 13837991.2 | 22.07.2013 | WO2013US51538 | Priority number, date | US201213611786 | 12.09.2012 Original published format: US201213611786 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014042766 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896208 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2368, H04N13/00, H04N19/597, H04N13/02, H04N5/268, // H04N7/01, H04N21/81 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H04N5/268 (EP,CN,US);
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,CN,US);
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,CN,US);
H04N13/296 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/181 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | H04N21/2368 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | KOMBINIEREN VON VIDEO- UND AUDIOSTRÖMEN MIT PIXELWIEDERHOLUNGSBANDBREITE | [2015/30] | English: | COMBINING VIDEO AND AUDIO STREAMS UTILIZING PIXEL REPETITION BANDWIDTH | [2015/30] | French: | COMBINAISON DE FLUX VIDÉO ET AUDIO AU MOYEN D'UNE BANDE PASSANTE À RÉPÉTITION DE PIXELS | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 16.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002021261 (WERNER WILLIAM B [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0049] * * figures 6,10,11 * [I] 3,5-8,11-14; | [I]US6914637 (WOLF PAUL DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 7, lines 23-60 * * column 11, lines 47-67 * * column 14, lines 4-39 * * column 29, lines 29-30 * * column 41, line 35 - column 42, line 15 *; | [A]EP2362653 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP2389765 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0087] * | International search | [X]US2011211639 (JONES ANTHONY RICHARD [GB]); | [A]US2009168812 (CROOKES BRIAN E [CA], et al); | [A]US2007286243 (OLSHANSKY AVIGDOR [IL], et al); | [A]EP2228985 (ADVANCED DIGITAL BROADCAST SA [CH]); | [A]KR20120069795 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) |