EP2899224 - AQUEOUS LIQUID ABSORBING RESIN, AQUEOUS LIQUID ABSORBING COMPOSITION, AND ABSORBENT BODY AND ABSORBENT ARTICLE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Yusuke c/o SANYO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 11-1 Ikkyo Nomotocho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | 02 /
KANDA, Yoichi c/o SANYO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 11-1 Ikkyo Nomotocho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 13838248.6 | 18.09.2013 | WO2013JP75106 | Priority number, date | JP20120208416 | 21.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012208416 | [2015/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014046106 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899224 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08G81/02, C08F251/00, C08K5/00, C08L51/02, C08L1/02, C08L3/04, C08L1/04, C08L3/10, C08B15/02, C08B31/18 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
C08F251/00 (EP,US);
C08F265/02 (US);
C08B15/02 (EP,US);
C08B31/18 (EP,US);
C08B31/185 (EP,US);
C08J3/246 (EP,US);
C08L1/04 (EP,US);
C08L3/10 (EP,US);
C08L51/02 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530481 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530708 (EP,US);
C08J2303/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L1/04, C08L33/02 (EP,US);
C08L3/10, C08L33/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/31] | C08G81/02, C08F251/00, C08K5/00, C08L51/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE FLÜSSIGKEITEN ABSORBIERENDES HARZ, WÄSSRIGE FLÜSSIGKEITEN ABSORBIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SAUGFÄHIGER KÖRPER SOWIE SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL DAMIT | [2015/31] | English: | AQUEOUS LIQUID ABSORBING RESIN, AQUEOUS LIQUID ABSORBING COMPOSITION, AND ABSORBENT BODY AND ABSORBENT ARTICLE USING SAME | [2015/31] | French: | RÉSINE ABSORBANTE DE LIQUIDE AQUEUX, COMPOSITION ABSORBANTE DE LIQUIDE AQUEUX, ET CORPS ABSORBANT ET ARTICLE ABSORBANT LES UTILISANT | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2015 | Translation filed | 20.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 06.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 18.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5747570 (DATE MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2006131767 (SAN DIA POLYMER LTD) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101014467 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]US2008089940 (OMIDIAN HOSSEIN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2012128264 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [P]EP2690133 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [P] * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; [0006]-[0040]; claims 1-25; figure 1; examples * | International search | [A]JPS51125683 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]JPS5282715 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]JPS53149545 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD, et al); | [A]JPS604583 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPS617316 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [A]JPH01285119 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]JPH03174414 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD, et al); | [A]JPH03177431 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]JP2007270152 (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH); | [A]JP2008303319 (SAN DIA POLYMER LTD); | [XP]WO2012128264 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS51136588 | JPS59189103 | JPS61211305 | JPS61252212 | JPS61257235 | JPS62247837 | EP0489424 | JPH10195101 | JP3205168B | JP2003225565 | JP2006131767 | JP2011252088 | - F. MASUDA, CHEMICAL ECONOMY & ENGINEERING REVIEW, (198311), page 19P | - Perrys Chemical Engineer's Handbook, 6th ed., MCGRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY, (1984), page 21 |