EP2898816 - INSERTION AID, INSERTION BODY, AND INSERTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIIE, Takehiro c/o Intellectual Property Support Department OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO. LTD. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 02 /
NAITO, Kimihiko c/o Intellectual Property Support Department OLYMPUS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES CO. LTD. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13838319.5 | 22.08.2013 | WO2013JP72479 | Priority number, date | JP20120206170 | 19.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012206170 | [2015/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014045795 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898816 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/01, A61M25/01 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A61B1/0016 (EP,US);
A61B1/00071 (EP,US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,US);
A61B1/00148 (EP);
A61B1/00154 (US);
A61B1/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0113 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | EINFÜHRHILFE, EINSETZKÖRPER UND EINSETZVORRICHTUNG | [2015/31] | English: | INSERTION AID, INSERTION BODY, AND INSERTION DEVICE | [2015/31] | French: | AIDE D'INTRODUCTION, CORPS D'INTRODUCTION ET DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2015 | Translation filed | 09.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012029281 (FRASSICA JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 105-109 * * paragraphs [0500] - [0508] *; | [E]EP2668888 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,7-10 * figure 21 * * the whole document *; | [E]EP2896346 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,7-10 * figures 1-3 * * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2007185394 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [Y]WO2006109598 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011140118 (SPIRUS MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2006129359 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009254554 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2007185394 |