EP2899550 - SHUNT RESISTANCE-TYPE CURRENT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Takashi c/o YAZAKI CORPORATION 1500 Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 410-1194 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 13838634.7 | 20.09.2013 | WO2013JP75533 | Priority number, date | JP20120208093 | 21.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012208093 | [2015/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014046246 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899550 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/14 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G01R1/203 (EP,US);
G01R19/0092 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMSENSOR MIT SHUNTWIDERSTAND | [2015/31] | English: | SHUNT RESISTANCE-TYPE CURRENT SENSOR | [2015/31] | French: | CAPTEUR DE COURANT DE TYPE RÉSISTANCE EN DÉRIVATION | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | Translation filed | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 03.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000131350 (YAZAKI CORP); | [A]US2008238431 (SCHIMMEL RALF [DE]); | [Y]JP2009177903 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2005188972 | JP2005188973 | JP2009040314 |