EP2881914 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Kunihiko c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
MITOME, Toru c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Shinji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2015/24] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13839221.2 | 29.08.2013 | [2018/17] | WO2013JP05097 | Priority number, date | JP20120209420 | 24.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012209420 | [2015/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014045525 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881914 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2881914 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, G01N21/17, H04N1/60, G02B21/00, G06K9/46, H04N7/01 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
G06T3/4015 (EP,US);
G02B21/008 (US);
H04N7/01 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G06T3/40, G01N21/17, H04N1/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/24] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2015/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | Translation filed | 03.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 19.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2013 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | IE | 29.08.2018 | LU | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 29.08.2013 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007211307 (UVAROV TIMOFEI [KR]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0030] - [0037] - [0059] - [0063] * [I] 3-13; | [A]US2012140983 (KISHIMA KOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0100] *; | [A] - Rami Cohen, "Demosaicing Algorithms Contents", (20100830), URL: http://tx.technion.ac.il/~rc/Demosaicing_algorithms.pdf, (20150204), XP055246661 [A] 6 * Section 1.1, in particular "bilinear interpolation generates significant artifacts, especially across edges". * | [A] - PETR DOSTAL ET AL, "Locally adaptive demosaicing technique for security images based upon region-of-interest analysis", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY (ICCST), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111018), doi:10.1109/CCST.2011.6095925, ISBN 978-1-4577-0902-9, pages 1 - 10, XP032069100 [A] 8,12 * abstract * * equation 4 and surrounding paragraphs * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.2011.6095925 | International search | [Y]JP2000331143 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2005012479 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2009125432 (TOPCON CORP); | [Y]JP2011180925 (RICOH CO LTD); | [Y]JP2012175241 (TOSHIBA CORP) | Examination | EP1489556 | US2009135278 | by applicant | JP2012117930 |