EP2898044 - SOLID HYDROGEL MEDIA AND METHODS OF PREPARATION AND USE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moasis Inc. 32930 Alvarado Niles Road, Suite 350 Union City, CA 94587 / US | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Naihong 688 Toyon Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
GU, Quan 14 Shannon Circle Alameda, California 94502 / US | 03 /
WU, Jen-chieh 845 Nectarine Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Chapman IP Kings Park House 22 Kings Park Road Southampton SO15 2AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | chapman + co Senghennydd Road Cardiff, South Wales CF24 4AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13839366.5 | 18.09.2013 | WO2013CA50714 | Priority number, date | US201261702657P | 18.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261702657 P | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014043808 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898044 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K17/40, C08J3/075, C09K17/22, A01C1/06, C05G3/04, C09K17/48 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
C09K17/40 (EP,US);
A01N25/04 (EP,US);
C05G3/80 (EP,US);
C05G5/14 (EP,US);
C05G5/40 (EP,US);
C08J3/075 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/04, A01N25/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | C09K17/00, C08J3/075 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | FESTE HYDROGELMEDIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2015/31] | English: | SOLID HYDROGEL MEDIA AND METHODS OF PREPARATION AND USE THEREFOR | [2015/31] | French: | MILIEU D'HYDROGEL SOLIDE AINSI QUE SES PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 23.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB1194227 (SEIKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9 * examples 16-31 * * tables IV-VI * [A] 2,8,10-15 [I] 6; | [XAI]US3759857 (BRACKE W) [X] 1,3-5,8,9 * claims 1,9,10 * * column 3, line 5 - line 64 * [A] 13-15[I] 6,10-12; | [XAI]EP1145621 (M & M LAB CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,13,15 * claims 8-15 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0152] * * examples 5, 7 * [A] 9-12 [I] 6,8,14 | International search | [X]WO2012064787 (W & L POLYMERS LTD [CA], et al) |