EP2897921 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF GRAPHENE/SILICON CARBIDE CERAMIC COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Penn State Research Foundation The Pennsylvania State University 304 Old Main University Park, PA 16802-1504 / US | For all designated states Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) c/ Serrano 142 28006 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states The Penn State Research Foundation The Pennsylvania State University 304 Old Main University Park, PA 16802-1504 / US | ||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) c/ Serrano 142 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states The Penn State Research Foundation The Pennsylvania State University 304 Old Main University Park University Park, PA 16802-1504 / US | ||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas Ott- CSCI C/ Serrano 142 28006 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRANZO, Pilar Castrillo de Aza 11 Esc 1 9C 28031 Madrid / ES | 02 /
OCAL, Carmen Avinguda Can Castellvi 24 08750 Molins de Rei / ES | 03 /
OSENDI, Maria, Isabel Catalina Suarez 5 4-1 28007 Madrid / ES | 04 /
BELMONTE, Manuel Rocinante 6 6C 28034 Madrid / ES | 05 /
RAMIREZ, Cristina Antonio Machado 33 4D 28035 Madrid / ES | 06 /
ROMAN-MANSO, Benito Obispo Nieto 62-2 49031 Zamora / ES | 07 /
GUITIERREZ, Humberto, R. 3334 Audubon Ridge Drive Louisville, KY 40213 / US | 08 /
TERRONES, Mauricio 916-5 Southgate Drive State College, PA 16801 / US | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 13839518.1 | 19.09.2013 | [2017/51] | WO2013US60614 | Priority number, date | US201261703495P | 20.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261703495 P | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014047283 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2897921 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2897921 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y30/00, C04B35/64, C04B35/573, C04B35/575, C04B35/577, C04B35/626, C04B35/645, H01B1/18 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (US);
C04B35/575 (EP,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
H01B1/04 (EP,US);
H01B1/18 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/383 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3834 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/425 (EP,US);
C04B2235/443 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | C04B35/577, C04B35/64, B82Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRAPHEN/SILICIUMCARBID-KERAMIKVERBUNDSTOFFEN | [2015/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF GRAPHENE/SILICON CARBIDE CERAMIC COMPOSITES | [2015/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSITES CÉRAMIQUES À BASE DE GRAPHÈNE/CARBURE DE SILICIUM | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 16.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2013 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | IE | 19.09.2018 | LU | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
IE | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007212538 (NIU CHUNMING [US]) [A] 1-18 * figures 1-38 * * paragraphs [0112] - [0115] - [0209] *; | [XAI]US2011177322 (OGRIN DOUGLAS CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,12,13 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3,10 * * paragraphs [0117] , [0127] , [0129] * [A] 9,10,16-18 [I] 2,6-8,11,14,15; | [A] - ZHU KAIXING ET AL, "Graphene covered SiC powder as advanced photocatalytic material", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, vol. 100, no. 2, doi:10.1063/1.3676042, ISSN 0003-6951, (20120109), pages 23113 - 23113, (20120112), XP012156076 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1, column right, paragraph 2 * * page 4, column left, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3676042 | [XP] - PILAR MIRANZO ET AL, "In situ processing of electrically conducting graphene/SiC nanocomposites", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY., GB, (20130219), vol. 33, no. 10, doi:10.1016/j.jeurceramsoc.2013.01.021, ISSN 0955-2219, pages 1665 - 1674, XP055266448 [XP] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1666, column left, paragraph 4 - page 1667, column right, paragraph 1 * * page 1773, column left, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jeurceramsoc.2013.01.021 | [A] - LEI WANG ET AL, "Mass Production of Graphene via an in Situ Self-Generating Template Route and Its Promoted Activity as Electrocatalytic Support for Methanol Electroxidization", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, US, (20100520), vol. 114, no. 19, doi:10.1021/jp911292p, ISSN 1932-7447, pages 8727 - 8733, XP055266138 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 8732, column left, paragraph 2 - column right, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp911292p | International search | [X]US2007212538 (NIU CHUNMING [US]); | [A]WO2010123902 (YSI INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2011086382 (NANORIDGE MATERIALS INC [US], et al); | [A] - "Khimicheskaya tekhnologiya keramiki pod red. prof. I. Ya. Guzmana. Moskva, 000 RIF", STROIMATERIALY, (2003), page 435, 436, XP008179173 | by applicant | US2011177322 | - YANNOPOULOS ET AL., ADV. FUNC. MATER., (2012), vol. 22, page 113 | - ZHU ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2012), vol. 100, page 023113 |