EP2897818 - CENTRAL TIRE INFLATION SYSTEM PRESSURE REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stemco LP 300 East Industrial Boulevard Longview, TX 75602 / US | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRANZ, Mark, J. 295 Cedar Ridge Road Longview, TX 75602 / US | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Hopkin, Tobias J.B. J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13839591.8 | 19.09.2013 | [2017/26] | WO2013US60531 | Priority number, date | US201261703109P | 19.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261703109 P | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014047240 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2897818 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2897818 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60C29/00, F16K99/00, F16K31/00, B60C23/00 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
B60C23/00363 (EP,US);
B60C23/00354 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | B60C29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRALER DRUCKREGLER FÜR REIFENBEFÜLLSYSTEM | [2017/07] | English: | CENTRAL TIRE INFLATION SYSTEM PRESSURE REGULATOR | [2015/31] | French: | RÉGULATEUR DE PRESSION DE SYSTÈME DE GONFLAGE PNEUMATIQUE CENTRAL | [2015/31] |
Former [2015/31] | ZENTRALER DRUCKREGLER FÜR REIFENAUFBLASSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 16.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2013 | AL | 28.06.2017 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | IE | 19.09.2017 | LU | 19.09.2017 | MT | 19.09.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
MT | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
MT | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
MT | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
MT | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
MT | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
MT | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4765385 (MCGEACHY DONALD E [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011022267 (MICROSTAQ INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0065]; figures 7-9 * | International search | [Y]US2009020170 (ANDERSON JULIA [US], et al); | [Y]US2009096599 (KRANZ MARK J [US]); | [Y]US2011132484 (TEACH WILLIAM O [US], et al); | [Y]US2001015224 (FREIGANG ALAN R [US], et al); | [A]US4583566 (KALAVITZ PAUL V [US], et al); | [A]US2003080862 (KRANZ MARK J [US]) | by applicant | US4765385 | WO2011022267 |